EP2625477 - REFRIGERATOR WITH A COLD ACCUMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states va-Q-tec AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 33 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLF, Bertram Scheidemannstraße 49 89518 Heidenheim / DE | 02 /
BAILLY, Frank Holzstraße 48 89233 Neu-Ulm / DE | 03 /
STELZER, Jörg Hochgratweg 15 89537 Giengen / DE | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 11757654.6 | 20.09.2011 | [2020/07] | WO2011EP66276 | Priority number, date | DE20101041952 | 04.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010041952 | [2013/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012045573 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2625477 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2625477 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F25D11/00, F25D16/00, F25D17/06 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
F25D11/006 (EP);
F25D16/00 (EP);
F25D17/062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTEGERÄT MIT EINEM KÄLTESPEICHER | [2013/33] | English: | REFRIGERATOR WITH A COLD ACCUMULATOR | [2013/33] | French: | APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE COMPRENANT UN ACCUMULATEUR DE FROID | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2011 | AL | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | DK | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | ES | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SE | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | AT | 20.09.2020 | IE | 20.09.2020 | IT | 20.09.2020 | LU | 20.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | NL | 01.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.09.2011 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
IT | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.09.2011 | |
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
IT | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
IT | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
IT | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
AT | 20.09.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
IE | 20.09.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/30] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
NL | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
DK | 12.02.2020 | ||
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 12.02.2020 | |
ES | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SE | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4928501 (NEGISHI KOZABURO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-9 * column 1, line 36 - line 52 * * column 3, line 23 - line 45 * * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 1,3-9 * [I] 4,5; | [X]FR1239733 (PETIT JOSEPH-PROSPER) [X] 1-3,6,7,9 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]DE69500621T (FAFOURNOUX BERNARD [FR]) [XD] 1,3,6-8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,9 [I] 4,5; | [Y]US5921104 (CHANG EUI-YOUNG [KR]) [Y] 2,9 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 2 * * column 5, line 9 - line 12 * * figures 1,2,5-8,9a,9b *; | [A]EP0770839 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 13 - column 4, line 8 * * figure 2 *; | [A]JPH01318871 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2004177637 (HU ZIQIANG [US]) [A] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0020] * * figure 3 * | Examination | JPS58219379 | CN201262493Y | JPH0732870 | JPS62271930 | JPS63318495 | by applicant | DE69500621T |