EP2616447 - PYRAZINE DERIVATIVES AS ENAC BLOCKERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHALAY, Gurdip Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 02 /
EDWARDS, Lee Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 03 /
HOWSHAM, Catherine Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 04 /
HUNT, Peter Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | 05 /
SMITH, Nichola Novartis Pharmaceuticals UK Limited Wimblehurst Road Horsham West Sussex Sussex RH12 5AB / GB | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | von Sprecher, Georg, et al Novartis Pharma AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Mueller, Philippe Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11757864.1 | 16.09.2011 | WO2011EP66151 | Priority number, date | US201161524495P | 17.08.2011 Original published format: US 201161524495 P | US20100383985P | 17.09.2010 Original published format: US 383985 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012035158 | Date: | 22.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2616447 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2616447 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D241/26, C07D403/12, C07D487/10, A61K31/497, A61P11/00 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
C07D241/26 (EP,US);
C07D471/10 (CN,KR);
A61K31/4747 (KR);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/10 (EP);
A61P11/12 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | 17.04.2013 | Title | German: | PYRAZINDERIVATE ALS ENAC-BLOCKERS | [2014/21] | English: | PYRAZINE DERIVATIVES AS ENAC BLOCKERS | [2013/30] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRAZINE COMME BLOQUEURS DU CANAL SODIQUE ÉPITHÉLIAL | [2014/21] |
Former [2013/30] | PYRAZINDERIVATE ALS ENAC-BLOCKER | ||
Former [2013/30] | DÉRIVÉS DE LA PYRAZINE EN TANT QUE BLOQUEURS DE L'ENAC | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2009074575 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2009150137 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | US3714357 | US3991761 | EP0039051 | EP0424021 | WO9219594 | US5171744 | JPH0525045B | WO9318007 | WO9319749 | WO9319750 | WO9319751 | EP0642992 | WO9514089 | WO9720589 | WO9725086 | WO9730743 | WO9818796 | WO9916766 | WO9964035 | WO0000531 | WO0066558 | WO0066559 | WO0075114 | US6166037 | WO0104118 | WO0113953 | WO0142193 | WO0183462 | WO0200679 | WO0200652 | WO0210143 | WO0212266 | US2002055651 | WO0242298 | WO02051841 | WO02053564 | WO02066422 | WO02070490 | WO02076933 | WO02088167 | WO02100879 | WO03000840 | US6536427 | WO03024439 | WO03033495 | WO03035668 | WO03039544 | WO03042160 | WO03042164 | WO03048181 | WO03053966 | WO03062259 | WO03064445 | WO03072592 | WO03072539 | WO03077979 | WO03082280 | WO03082787 | WO03086294 | WO03087094 | WO03091204 | WO03099764 | WO03099807 | WO03101932 | WO03104195 | WO03104204 | WO03104205 | WO2004000814 | WO2004000839 | WO2004005229 | WO2004005258 | WO2004005285 | WO2004016601 | WO2004016578 | WO2004018425 | WO2004018429 | WO2004018450 | WO2004018451 | WO2004018457 | WO2004018465 | WO2004018431 | WO2004018449 | WO2004018422 | WO2004019935 | WO2004019944 | WO2004019945 | WO2004022547 | WO2004026873 | WO2004026248 | WO2004026841 | JP2004107299 | WO2004032921 | WO2004033412 | WO2004037805 | WO2004037768 | WO2004037773 | WO2004037807 | WO2004039827 | WO2004039762 | WO2004039766 | WO2004045607 | WO2004045618 | WO2004046083 | DE10261874 | EP1440966 | WO2004066920 | US2004167167 | WO2004074246 | WO2004074812 | WO2004078163 | WO2004080972 | WO2004080964 | WO2004108765 | WO2004108676 | WO2004111014 | WO2004110352 | WO2005026137 | WO2005035514 | WO2005037353 | US2005176761 | WO2005075435 | US2005183724 | WO2005113042 | WO2005120497 | WO2006099256 | WO2006101740 | WO2006127588 | WO2007021982 | WO2008051621 | WO2009074575 | WO2009117112 |