EP2613940 - A CARBON DIOXIDE BARRIER COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Chemical B.V. Leeuwenveldseweg 3-t 1382 LV Weesp / NL | [2020/27] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Sun Chemical B.V. Leeuwenveldseweg 3-t 1382 LV Weesp / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILLSLEY, Derek Ronald 37 Lynfield Road Frome Somerset BA11 4JB / GB | 02 /
KHAN, Sarfaraz Akhtar 26 Ballards Way South Croydon CR2 7JL / GB | 03 /
STREET, Graham Trevor Top Floor Flat 26 The Gardens East Dulwich London Greater London SE22 9QE / GB | [2020/27] |
Former [2014/27] | 01 /
ILLSLEY, Derek Ronald 37 Lynfield Road Frome Somerset BA11 4JB / GB | ||
02 /
KHAN, Sarfaraz Akhtar 26 Ballards Way South Croydon, CR2 7JL / GB | |||
03 /
STREET, Graham Trevor Top Floor Flat 26 The Gardens East Dulwich London Greater London SE22 9QE / GB | |||
Former [2013/35] | 01 /
ILLSLEY, Derek Ronald 37 Lynfield Road Frome Somerset BA11 4JB / GB | ||
02 /
KHAN, Sarfaraz Akhtar 73 Cray Avenue Orpington Kent BR5 4AA / GB | |||
03 /
STREET, Graham Trevor Top Floor Flat 26 The Gardens East Dulwich London Greater London SE22 9QE / GB | |||
Former [2013/29] | 01 /
ILLSLEY, Derek Ronald 43 Pembroke Road Coxheath Maidstone Kent ME17 4QJ / GB | ||
02 /
KHAN, Sarfaraz Akhtar 73 Cray Avenue Orpington Kent BR5 4AA / GB | |||
03 /
STREET, Graham Trevor Top Floor Flat 26 The Gardens East Dulwich London Greater London SE22 9QE / GB | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2020/27] |
Former [2013/29] | Fletcher, Matthew James Edwin, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London, WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11757923.5 | 07.09.2011 | [2020/27] | WO2011GB51670 | Priority number, date | US20100380357P | 07.09.2010 Original published format: US 380357 P | US20100423370P | 15.12.2010 Original published format: US 423370 P | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012032343 | Date: | 15.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2613940 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2613940 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J7/04, C08K3/34, C09D7/61, C08J9/00 | [2020/11] | CPC: |
C09D7/61 (EP,US);
B65B25/001 (US);
B65B31/02 (US);
B65B5/10 (US);
B65D81/20 (US);
B65D85/72 (US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/048 (EP,US);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
C09D129/04 (US);
C09D129/06 (US);
C09D167/00 (US);
C09D7/70 (EP,US);
C08J2323/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | B32B27/18, B32B27/30, C08K3/34, C09D7/12, C08J7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHLENSTOFFDIOXID-SPERRSCHICHT | [2013/29] | English: | A CARBON DIOXIDE BARRIER COATING | [2013/29] | French: | REVÊTEMENT PROTECTEUR CONTRE LE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2013/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.11.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2011 | AL | 01.07.2020 | AT | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | DK | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | IT | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | MT | 01.07.2020 | NL | 01.07.2020 | PL | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SE | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | IE | 07.09.2020 | LU | 07.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | NO | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.09.2011 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MT | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
TR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
IE | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
LU | 07.09.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
AT | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
DK | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
IT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
NL | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
PL | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
SE | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
NO | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0761739 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-23 * page 1, lines 6-18; examples 1-9,11 * * page 7, lines 2-7 *; | [X]US6225394 (LAN TIE [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 22, line 60 - column 23, line 3; examples 8,10; claims 28,46 * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 12 *; | [X]EP1538127 (SAKATA INX CORP [JP]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0008] , [0033] , [0043] - [0057] - [0060] , [0061] , [0069] , [0075]; examples 1,2; claims 7-12 *; | [X]EP1666637 (SAKATA INX CORP [JP]) [X] 1-23 * paragraphs [0003] , [0036] - [0050] - [0053] , [0054] , [0066]; example 1; claims 1-3, 7,8 *; | [A]WO2007058869 (GRAHAM PACKAGING PET TECH [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0019] , [0025] , [0026]; claims 15,16,43,65,66, *; | [A]WO2007062391 (TRITON SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0009]; example 1; table 1; compound film 1 *; | [AD]WO2009027648 (SUN CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2009098463 (SUN CHEMICAL LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-23* the whole document * | by applicant | JPS5954557 | DE3518875 | US4818782 | JPH01313536 | EP0470777 | EP0479031 | EP0590263 | WO9526997 | US5882798 | JPH11246729 | GB2337470 | EP0590263 | US6599622 | US6709735 | US6991837 | JP2007136984 | JP2008080540 | EP1451008 | WO2009027648 | WO2009070800 | WO2009098463 | WO2010065966 | - P.DEHASSUS, MODEM PLASTICS, (1983), vol. 60, no. 1, pages 86 - 88 | - R. DAVIS, ANNUAL TECHNICAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS - SOCIETY OF VACUUM COATERS, (1998), vol. 41, pages 505 - 506 | - C.BIRCHLER, "Fraunhofer-Institut fur Lebensmitteltechnologie und Verpackung,Munich, Germany", COATING, (1994), vol. 27, no. 8, pages 274 - 280 | - E. PALASSET, FR. CAOUTCHOUCS & PLASTIQUES, (2000), vol. 77, no. 784, pages 42 - 43 | - M. MINELLI, POLYM.ENG.SCI., (2010), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 144 - 153 | - Plastics Finishing and Decoration, VAN NOSTRAND REINHOLD COMPANY, (1986), pages 80 - 86 |