EP2748695 - FORCE SENSITIVE TOUCH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications Inc. 4-12-3 Higashi-Shinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2019/01] |
Former [2014/27] | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÅBERG, Peter Bertes väg 17 S-288 31 Vinslöv / SE | 02 /
KLINGHULT, Gunnar Änggatan 10A S-22 359 Lund / SE | [2014/27] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2019/01] |
Former [2014/27] | Meier, Florian Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11758397.1 | 16.09.2011 | [2019/01] | WO2011EP04655 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013037385 | Date: | 21.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2748695 | Date: | 02.07.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2748695 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044, G06F3/042 | [2014/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0445 (EP,US);
G01L1/14 (US);
G01L1/18 (US);
G06F3/041 (EP,US);
G06F3/0421 (EP,US);
G06F3/0443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTEMPFINDLICHER BERÜHRUNGSSENSOR | [2014/27] | English: | FORCE SENSITIVE TOUCH SENSOR | [2014/27] | French: | CAPTEUR TACTILE SENSIBLE À LA FORCE | [2014/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/27] | 22.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2011 | AL | 02.01.2019 | AT | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | GB | 16.09.2019 | IE | 16.09.2019 | LU | 16.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | FR | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
GB | 16.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
AT | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2010201635 (KLINGHULT GUNNAR [SE], et al) [YD] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 43] - [0049] * * figures 1-4,6 *; | [Y]US2010123686 (KLINGHULT GUNNAR [SE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 3A, 3B, 8-10 *; | [Y]US2011163298 (SUNG CHIEN-MIN [TW]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0 27] - [0029] *; | [Y]US2008048996 (HU LIANGBING [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [00 8] , [00 9] *; | [Y]US2011129675 (CHOI JAE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0062] , [0 77] *; | [Y]WO2011010484 (KONICA MINOLTA MED & GRAPHIC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US2009085894 (GANDHI SHRIPAL [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0 45] , [0 59] , [0060] * * figures 1-7 *; | [Y]US2011175060 (OKAI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0097] - [0099] *; | [Y]WO2011025216 (IUCF HYU [KR], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract *; | [Y]US2010200839 (OKAI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0090] , [0 91] *; | [Y]US2011006837 (WANG FENG [US], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *; | [Y]US2011041980 (KIM TAE-WHAN [KR], et al) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 62] , [0 75] , [ 110] - [0113] *; | [Y]CN101859858 (SUZHOU INST NANO TECH & NANO BIONICS CAS) [Y] 3-6,9-12 * abstract * | Examination | US9417141 | by applicant | WO2010091744 |