EP2550117 - COVER SYSTEM FOR WASTE SITES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Watershed Geosynthetics LLC 11400 Atlantis Place, Suite 200 Alpharetta GA 30022 / US | [2016/03] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states ClosureTurf LLC 11200 Atlantis Parkway, Suite E Alpharetta, GA 30022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ayers, Michael, R. 3530 Waters Cove WayAlpharetta Georgia 30027 / US | 02 /
Urrutia, Jose L. 3665 Ansley Park DriveSuwanee Georgia 30024 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/39] | MacLachlan & Donaldson 2b Clonskeagh Square Clonskeagh Road Dublin 14 / IE | ||
Former [2013/05] | Walsh, Marie Goretti, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson, 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11759821.9 | 21.03.2011 | [2016/08] | WO2011US00506 | Priority number, date | US20100661643 | 22.03.2010 Original published format: US 661643 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011119204 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2550117 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550117 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B09B1/00, E02D17/20 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
B09B1/004 (EP,US);
Y02W30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKUNGSSYSTEM FÜR ABFALLLAGERUNGSORTE | [2013/05] | English: | COVER SYSTEM FOR WASTE SITES | [2013/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COUVERTURE POUR DÉCHARGES | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 23.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2011 | AL | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | LU | 21.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LU | 21.03.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.03.2011 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | BE | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | BE | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | BE | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | DK | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4946719 (DEMPSEY BARRY J [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US6299959 (SQUIRES TROY [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2004086664 (SEATON REED [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,4,19,21 *; | [A]WO2005042846 (WATERFORD GARY WAYNE [AU]) [A] 1-10* claim 1 *; | [X]US2008069642 (AYERS MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0011] , [0060]; figure 3; claims 1-8 * | International search | [A]US2003194275 (IANNIELLO PETER J [US], et al); | [A]US2005158123 (IANNIELLO PETER J [US], et al); | [X]US2008069642 (AYERS MICHAEL R [US], et al) | by applicant | US5258217 | US5876745 | US6858272 | US6877932 | US6946181 | US2008069642 |