EP2549940 - LOCKABLE ORIENTATION INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2020 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith & Nephew, Inc. 7135 Goodlett Farms Parkway Cordova, TN 38016 / US | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEES, Roger, Ryan 1283 Yellowdog Road Senatobia, MS 38668 / US | 02 /
SHARP, Jeffrey, Andrew 1155 E. 2100 S. Apt. 845 Salt Lake City, UT 84106 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Smith & Nephew Group Legal Department PO Box 81 101 Hessle Road Hull HU3 2BN / GB | [2019/24] |
Former [2014/39] | Smith & Nephew Group Research Centre York Science Park Heslington York YO10 5DF / GB | ||
Former [2013/05] | Haley, Roger David Smith & Nephew UK Limited Research Centre York Science Park Heslington, York YO10 5DF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11760023.9 | 22.03.2011 | [2019/24] | WO2011US29321 | Priority number, date | US20100728490 | 22.03.2010 Original published format: US 728490 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011119534 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2549940 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2549940 | Date: | 12.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/90, A61B17/84, A61B17/72, B23P17/04, // A61B17/15, A61B17/17 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61B2090/508 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | A61B17/90, A61B17/84, A61B17/72, B23P17/04, // A61B17/15, A61B19/00, A61B17/17 | ||
Former IPC [2013/05] | A61B17/90, A61B17/84, A61B17/72, B23P17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLIESSBARE ORIENTIERUNGSINSTRUMENTENANORDNUNG | [2013/05] | English: | LOCKABLE ORIENTATION INSTRUMENT ASSEMBLY | [2013/05] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'INSTRUMENTS À ORIENTATION VERROUILLABLE | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 18.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 29.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 14.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.04.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 14.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 14.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2011 | AL | 12.06.2019 | AT | 12.06.2019 | CY | 12.06.2019 | CZ | 12.06.2019 | DK | 12.06.2019 | EE | 12.06.2019 | ES | 12.06.2019 | FI | 12.06.2019 | HR | 12.06.2019 | IT | 12.06.2019 | LT | 12.06.2019 | LV | 12.06.2019 | MC | 12.06.2019 | MK | 12.06.2019 | MT | 12.06.2019 | NL | 12.06.2019 | PL | 12.06.2019 | RO | 12.06.2019 | RS | 12.06.2019 | SE | 12.06.2019 | SI | 12.06.2019 | SK | 12.06.2019 | SM | 12.06.2019 | TR | 12.06.2019 | BG | 12.09.2019 | NO | 12.09.2019 | GR | 13.09.2019 | IS | 12.10.2019 | PT | 14.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.03.2011 | |
AL | 12.06.2019 | ||
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CY | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
MT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
MC | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
PL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SI | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
DK | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
TR | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
SM | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
IT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
IS | 12.10.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
EE | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
SK | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
AT | 12.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RO | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
PT | 14.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
CZ | 12.06.2019 | ||
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
NL | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
BG | 12.09.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
LV | 12.06.2019 | ||
RS | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
GR | 13.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 12.06.2019 | |
ES | 12.06.2019 | ||
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
HR | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
SE | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 12.06.2019 | |
FI | 12.06.2019 | ||
LT | 12.06.2019 | ||
NO | 12.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4710075 (DAVISON DALE [US]) [X] 1,10,13-15 * column 4, line 31 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-4 * [Y] 6,8,9,12; | [X]US4952213 (BOWMAN JERALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,12-14 * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 63; figures 1,2 * * column 8, lines 49-64 *; | [A]US5257184 (MUSHABAC DAVID R [US]) [A] 3-5 * column 8, lines 9-11; figures 9,10 *; | [A]US5704941 (JACOBER JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 3* column 9, lines 6-28; figure 9 *; | [Y]US2006179979 (DEES ROGER R JR [US]) [Y] 6,8,9,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0032] , [0034] - [0036] - [0041] , [0043]; figures 2,4a,4b,6 * | International search | [X]US2006179979 (DEES ROGER R JR [US]); | [A]US2008183178 (COLLAZO CARLOS E [US]); | [A]US2009204115 (DEES JR ROGER RYAN [US], et al); | [A]US7601155 (PETERSEN THOMAS D [US]) | by applicant | US2006179979 |