EP2550838 - MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE HAVING RELATIVE POSITIONING CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2014/13] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Dr. West Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WONG, Kean 398 Upland Road Redwood City California 94062 / US | 02 /
MORISHIGE, Kevin 10500 Sunhills Drive Los Altos Hills California 94024 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Potter, Julian Mark WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11760243.3 | 24.03.2011 | WO2011US29844 | Priority number, date | US20100731490 | 25.03.2010 Original published format: US 731490 | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011119867 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2550838 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/02, H04W64/00, G01S1/68, G01S3/52, G01S5/00, G01S5/08, G01S5/12, H04W4/00, G06F3/01, H04W4/02, H04W4/04, G06F1/16, H04M1/725, G06F17/30 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
G01S1/68 (EP,US);
G01S5/0009 (EP,US);
G01S5/12 (EP,US);
G06F1/1684 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,US);
G06F1/1698 (EP,US);
G06F16/176 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP,US);
H04M1/72412 (EP,US);
H04W4/026 (EP,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | H04W88/02, H04W64/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Title | German: | MOBILE BERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT SCHALTUNG FÜR RELATIVE POSITIONIERUNG | [2013/05] | English: | MOBILE COMPUTING DEVICE HAVING RELATIVE POSITIONING CIRCUIT | [2013/05] | French: | DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE MOBILE AYANT UN CIRCUIT DE POSITIONNEMENT RELATIF | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 08.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 19.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003013461 (MIZUNE MASAHITO [JP], et al) [Y] 3,4,9,10 * paragraph [0027]; figures 4,5 *; | [XYI]US2004082341 (STANFORTH PETER J [US]) [X] 1,7 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * [Y] 3,4,9,10 [I] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11-14; | [A]WO2004075169 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]WO2006010977 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2004082341 (STANFORTH PETER J [US]); | [A]KR20050016840 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [X]KR20080003546 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]WO2010018903 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) |