EP2603312 - METHOD AND MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING TWO FLUIDS, AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PASCHEREIT, Christian Lohengrinstraße 29 14109 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LACARELLE, Arnaud Keppel Bay Drive 30 Unit No. 02-50 The Caribbean 098650 Singapore / SG | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/25] | 01 /
PASCHEREIT, Christian Lohengrinstraße 29 14109 Berlin / DE | ||
02 /
LACARELLE, Arnaud Wulfsheinstraße 4 10585 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Bittner, Thomas L. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11761485.9 | 20.06.2011 | WO2011DE75144 | Priority number, date | DE20101017523 | 22.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010017523 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012022324 | Date: | 23.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2603312 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01F5/04, B01F15/02, B01F13/00 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
B01F25/31331 (EP);
B01F25/31424 (EP);
B01F33/30 (EP);
B01F35/71755 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND MISCHVORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON ZWEI FLUIDEN SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2013/25] | English: | METHOD AND MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING TWO FLUIDS, AND USE THEREOF | [2013/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR MÉLANGER DEUX FLUIDES ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2013/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 07.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 07.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 09.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.06.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/37] | 04.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/37] | Appeal following examination | 24.08.2016 | Appeal received No. T2456/16 | 21.10.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.07.2018 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 04.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.07.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees FR, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 07.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 07.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2013 | Decision despatched | 07.05.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3748852 (COLE L, et al) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * figures 4,10,11-13 * * column 7, line 57 - column 8, line 45 * * column 11, line 45 - column 13, line 38 *; | [X]US7128082 (CERRETELLI CIRO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figures 1-4 * * column 4, line 67 - column 7, line 54 *; | [X]US2006079583 (HIGUCHI TOSHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,8,10 * figures 1,2 * * abstract *; | [X]WO2007147191 (REITER HEINZ [AT], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figures 1,2 * * page 6, line 15 - line 20 * * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 15 *; | [X]DE102004040735 (ETH ZUERICH INST FUER LEBENSMI [CH], et al) [X] 1-3,5-10 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0038] *; | [X]WO2007039265 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,8,10 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 4 - line 13 * * page 5, line 18 - line 22 * | by applicant | - HOLDEMAN ET AL., "Mixing in a Row of Jets with a Confined Crossflow", AIAA JOURNAL, (1977), vol. 15, pages 243 - 249 | - LISCINSKY ET AL., "Experimental Investigation of Crossflow Jet Mixing in a Rectangular Duct", AIAA PAPER, (1993), vol. 93, page 20037 | - LISCINSKY ET AL., "Crossflow Mixing of Noncircular jets", AIAA PAPER, (1995), vol. 95, page 0732 | - JOHARI ET AL., "Penetration and mixing of fully modulated turbulent jets in crossflow", AIAA JOURNAL, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS, (1999), vol. 37, pages 842 - 850 | - EROGLU ET AL., "Structure, penetration, and mixing of pulsed jets in crossflow", AIAA JOURNAL, (2001), vol. 39, pages 417 - 423 |