EP2552734 - A SYSTEM ADAPTED FOR ONE OR MORE ELECTRICALLY PROPELLABLE VEHICLES. (DETECTOR ARRANGEMENT). [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Elways AB Wiboms väg 21 3tr 171 60 Solna / SE | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Wiboms väg 21 3tr S-171 60 Solna / SE | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] |
Former [2013/06] | Löfgren, Håkan Bengt Alpo Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11763164.8 | 31.03.2011 | [2017/29] | WO2011SE50383 | Priority number, date | SE20100000329 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: SE 1000329 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123052 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552734 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552734 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60L5/40, G01V3/08 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
B60M1/36 (EP,US);
B60L5/40 (EP,SE,US);
G01V3/081 (SE);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜR EIN ODER MEHRERE ELEKTRISCH ANTREIBBARE FAHRZEUGE ANGEPASSTES SYSTEM (DETEKTORANORDNUNG). | [2013/06] | English: | A SYSTEM ADAPTED FOR ONE OR MORE ELECTRICALLY PROPELLABLE VEHICLES. (DETECTOR ARRANGEMENT). | [2013/06] | French: | SYSTÈME CONÇU POUR UN OU PLUSIEURS VÉHICULES PROPULSABLES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT (AGENCEMENT DE DÉTECTEURS) | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 11.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2011 | AL | 19.07.2017 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | HR | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | MK | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | RS | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | SM | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | DK | 31.03.2018 | FI | 31.03.2018 | IE | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | LU | 31.03.2018 | MT | 31.03.2018 | NO | 31.03.2018 | NL | 01.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 31.03.2011 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CY | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
MK | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
DK | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 31.03.2011 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
DK | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
DK | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
DK | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
MT | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
DK | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IE | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
NO | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
LU | 31.03.2018 | ||
NL | 01.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
FI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
SM | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
HR | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RS | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9310995 (MUSACHIO NICHOLAS R [US]) | International search | [A]US3914562 (BOLGER JOHN G); | [A]WO9310995 (MUSACHIO NICHOLAS R [US]); | [A]US5764127 (HORE DONALD LIONEL [GB], et al); | [A]EP0950558 (GOETTING HANS HEINRICH JR [DE]); | [A]US6011508 (PERREAULT BRIAN M [US], et al); | [A]WO2007056804 (ROBERTSON JOHN [AU]); | [AP]GB2464279 (THALES HOLDINGS UK PLC [GB]) |