EP2552262 - ENVIRONMENTALLY DEGRADABLE CIGARETTE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celanese Acetate LLC 1601 West LBJ Freeway Dallas, TX 75234 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTSON, Raymond M. 3210 Gordon Drive Blacksburg, VA 24060 / US | 02 /
THOMAS, William C. 342 Horseshoe Farm Road Pembroke, VA 24136 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Herr, Ulrike Maria, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11763203.4 | 09.03.2011 | WO2011US27645 | Priority number, date | US20100749543 | 30.03.2010 Original published format: US 749543 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123221 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552262 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/10 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A24D3/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24D3/02 (KR);
A24D3/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | UMWELTFREUNDLICH ABBAUBARER ZIGARETTENFILTER | [2013/06] | English: | ENVIRONMENTALLY DEGRADABLE CIGARETTE FILTER | [2013/06] | French: | FILTRE DE CIGARETTE DÉGRADABLE DANS L'ENVIRONNEMENT | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 30.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 11.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 25.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.06.2013 | 31.03.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2881772 (TOUEY GEORGE P, et al); | [Y]US2009151738 (ROBERTSON RAYMOND M [US], et al) |