EP2553751 - HIGH TEMPERATURE MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY WITH HIGH POWER DENSITY AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF MAKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trenergi Corp. 116 South Street Hopkinton, MA 01748 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENAYETULLAH, Mohammad, Allama 18 Howard Farm Road Sharon, MA 02067 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Sackin, Robert Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | Application number, filing date | 11763224.0 | 21.03.2011 | WO2011US29221 | Priority number, date | US20100320040P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 320040 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123275 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553751 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/10, H01M4/92, H01M4/86 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H01M4/8663 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (US);
H01M4/925 (US);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
H01M4/928 (EP,US);
H01M8/1007 (EP,US);
H01M2300/008 (EP,US);
H01M8/1048 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | HOCHTEMPERATUR-MEMBRANELEKTRODENANORDNUNG MIT HOHER LEISTUNGSDICHTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/06] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE MEMBRANE ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY WITH HIGH POWER DENSITY AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF MAKING | [2013/06] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ÉLECTRODE À MEMBRANE À HAUTE TEMPÉRATURE, AVEC DENSITÉ DE PUISSANCE ÉLEVÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 13.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 30.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2717540 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US6946211 (BJERRUM NIELS JANNIKSEN [DK], et al) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2002192540 (KODAS TOIVO T [US], et al); | [Y]US2007026284 (RHEE HEE-WOO [KR], et al); | [Y]US2009169955 (UENSAL OEMER [DE], et al); | [Y]US2008248944 (THATE SVEN [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005260485 (SOPCHAK DAVID A [US], et al); | [Y]US2010009234 (STEFENER MANFRED [DE]); | [A]WO2008131551 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al); | [A]WO2009013540 (JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC [GB], et al) | [Y] - HUANG ET AL., "Catalyst Loadings for PEMFC Electrodes Prepared by Sputter Deposition.", MEET. ABSTRACTS. - THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY., (2006), URL: http://www.ecsdl.org/getabs/servIeUGetabsServlet? prog=normal&id=MAECES000601000005000264000001 &idtype=cvips&gifs=yes, (20110511), XP008159648 | by applicant | US5272017 | US5882810 | US6287717 | US6946211 | - S. SRINIVASAN ET AL., J POWER SOURCES, (1988), vol. 22, page 359 | - J POWER SOURCES, (1990), vol. 29, page 367 | - MAHLON S. WILSON ET AL., J. ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1992), vol. 139, no. 2 |