EP2552866 - AROMATIC ALKYLATION PROCESS USING UZM-37 ALUMINOSILICATE ZEOLITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAN, Deng-Yang UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | 02 /
MOSCOSO, Jaime G. UOP LLC 25 East Algonquin Road P.O. Box 5017 Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/02] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2013/06] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11763261.2 | 25.03.2011 | WO2011US29924 | Priority number, date | US20100751449 | 31.03.2010 Original published format: US 751449 | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011123344 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2552866 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.02.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C2/66, C07C15/00, B01J29/70 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
C07C2/66 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/66, C07C15/02 (US,EP);
C07C2/66, C07C15/073 (EP,US);
C07C2/66, C07C15/085 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | AROMATISCHES ALKYLIERUNGSVERFAHREN MIT UZM-37-ALUMINIUMSILIKAT-ZEOLIT | [2013/06] | English: | AROMATIC ALKYLATION PROCESS USING UZM-37 ALUMINOSILICATE ZEOLITE | [2013/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ALKYLATION AROMATIQUE À L'AIDE D'UNE ZÉOLITHE ALUMINOSILICATE UZM-37 | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 08.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 14.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US6388159 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al); | [A]US2004199036 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al); | [A]US2006247480 (JAN DENG-YANG [US], et al); | [A]US2006258893 (BENCINI ELENA [IT], et al) |