EP2552483 - ANTIBODY-BASED DEPLETION OF ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS AND DENDRITIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunomedics, Inc. 300 American Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Chien-Hsing 300 American Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | 02 /
GOLDENBERG, David, M. 300 American Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Bohmann, Armin K. Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11763313.1 | 29.03.2011 | WO2011US30294 | Priority number, date | US20100319902P | 01.04.2010 Original published format: US 319902 P | US20100329282P | 29.04.2010 Original published format: US 329282 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011123428 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552483 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K19/00, C07K16/28 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
C07K16/2833 (EP,US);
A61K47/6807 (EP,US);
A61K47/6813 (EP,US);
A61K47/6815 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61K47/6881 (EP,US);
A61K47/6885 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/18 (US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2851 (US);
C07K16/2863 (US);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/3007 (EP,US);
C07K16/3092 (US);
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/35 (EP,US);
C07K2317/51 (EP,US);
C07K2317/52 (EP,US);
C07K2317/522 (EP,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,US);
C07K2317/73 (EP,US);
C07K2317/734 (EP,US);
C07K2317/75 (EP,US);
C07K2317/77 (EP,US);
C07K2319/70 (EP,US);
C12N2310/14 (US);
C12N2310/3513 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/06] | A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPERVERMITTELTER ABBAU VON ANTIGENPRÄSENTIERENDEN ZELLEN UND DENDRITISCHEN ZELLEN | [2018/22] | English: | ANTIBODY-BASED DEPLETION OF ANTIGEN-PRESENTING CELLS AND DENDRITIC CELLS | [2013/06] | French: | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS POUR RÉDUIRE LE NOMBRE DE CELLULES PRESENTATRICES D'ANTIGENE ET DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES | [2018/22] |
Former [2013/06] | ANTIKÖRPERVERMITTELTER ABBAU VON ANTIGENTRAGENDEN ZELLEN UND DENDRITISCHEN ZELLEN | ||
Former [2013/06] | UTILISATION D'ANTICORPS POUR RÉDUIRE LE NOMBRE DE CELLULES CONTENANT DES ANTIGÈNES ET DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 09.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 29.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.01.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 26.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.06.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 09.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2011025904 (IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [XP] 1,4-11,14-16 * page 74 - page 88 *; | [X]WO2007075270 (IBC PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-11,14-16 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0040] * * figure 10 * * claim 8 *; | [X]WO9617874 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1,4-11 * pages 19, 22 *; | [XI]WO2005023299 (GPC BIOTECH AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-11 * page 89 - page 90 * * page 86 * [I] 12,13; | [XPI] - CHEN XIAOCHUAN ET AL, "Depletion of Blood Antigen-Presenting Cells by IMMU-114: Therapeutic Potential Against Graft-Versus-Host Disease", vol. 116, no. 21, ISSN 0006-4971, (20101101), page 1053, BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, URL: http://www.bloodjournal.org/, XP008164120 [XP] 1,4-11 * the whole document * [I] 12,13 | [X] - MICHEL ROSANA B ET AL, "Therapy of small subcutaneous B-lymphoma xenografts with antibodies conjugated to radionuclides emitting low-energy electrons.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH 15 JAN 2005, (20050115), vol. 11, no. 2 Pt 1, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 777 - 786, XP002711318 [X] 1,4-11 * the whole document * | [X] - ANNA E LOKSHIN ET AL, "Differential regulation of maturation and apoptosis of humen monocyte-derived dendritic celle mediated by MHC dass II", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, (20020901), vol. 14, no. 9, doi:10.1093/INTIMM/DXF073, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 1027 - 1037, XP008161720 [X] 1,4-11 * page 1028, column left, line 50 * * page 1028, column right, line 27 - line 29 * * figure 3 * * page 1030, column right * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxf073 | International search | [Y]US2007086942 (CHANG CHIEN H [US], et al); | [Y]US2008210475 (SILVERMAN ANDREW [US], et al); | [X]US2010015048 (HANSEN HANS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2010068137 (CHANG CHIEN-HSING [US], et al); | [X] - LOKSHIN ET AL., "Differential regulation of maturation and apoptosis of humen monocyte-derived dendritic celle mediated by MHC dass II", INT IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 14, no. 9, pages 1027 - 1037, XP008161720 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxf073 | [Y] - CHEN ET AL., "Differential Effects of Milatuzumab On Human Antigen-Pressenting Cells in Comparison to Malignant B Cells.", 51ST ASH ANNUAL MEETING, (2009), URL: http://ash.corifex.com/ash/2009/webprogram/Paper23675.html, (20110802), XP008161688 | [Y] - STEIN ET AL., "Combining milatuzumab with bortezomib, doxorubicin, or dexamethasone improves responses in multiple myeloma cell lines.", CLIN CANCER RES, (2009), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 2808 - 2817, XP008161722 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-1953 | [A] - BARRERA ET AL., "Polarized expression of CD74 by gastric epithellal cells.", J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (2005), vol. 53, no. 12, pages 1481 - 1489, XP008161721 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1369/jhc.4A6552.2005 | [A] - "HLA-DR.", WIKIPEDIA, (20100226), URL: http://en.wiklpedia.org/w/index.php?title=HLA-DR&oidid=346491680, (20100802), XP008161685 |