EP2580763 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE GASEOUS EXTRACTION OF MOLYBDENUM-99 AND OTHER FISSION PRODUCT RADIOISOTOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Atomics 3550 General Atomics Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Lloyd, C. 7067 Enders Avenue San Diego CA 92122 / US | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | Savic, Bojan, et al Jones Day Rechtsanwälte Attorneys-at-Law Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/16] | Ritter, Thomas Kurt Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11764369.2 | 08.06.2011 | WO2011US39551 | Priority number, date | US20100353102P | 09.06.2010 Original published format: US 353102 P | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011156446 | Date: | 15.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2580763 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2580763 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G21G1/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G21G1/001 (EP,US);
G21G1/00 (EP,US);
G21G2001/0036 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELEKTIVEN GASFÖRMIGEN EXTRAKTION VON MOLYBDÄN-99 UND ANDEREN SPALTPRODUKT-RADIOISOTOPEN | [2013/16] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR SELECTIVE GASEOUS EXTRACTION OF MOLYBDENUM-99 AND OTHER FISSION PRODUCT RADIOISOTOPES | [2013/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR L'EXTRACTION GAZEUSE SÉLECTIVE DE MOLYBDÈNE-99 ET D'AUTRES RADIO-ISOTOPES PRODUITS DE FISSION | [2013/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/16] | 03.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2011 | AL | 22.07.2015 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | HR | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MK | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | RS | 22.07.2015 | SE | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | SM | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
BG | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
TR | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.06.2011 | |
AT | 22.07.2015 | ||
CY | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
MK | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
SM | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
HR | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
RS | 22.07.2015 | ||
SE | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3148941 (GENS THEODORE A) [X] 1,2,8,10,11,17-22,25 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 2; column 3, line 14 - line 20; column 4, line 21 - line 26; column 5, line 1 - line 18; claim - * [I] 9,12,16,23,24,26-29; | [XI]US3208815 (MICHEL BOURGEOIS) [X] 1,2,18-22,26 * column 1, line 41 - line 54; claim - *[I] 8,9,11,12,16,17,24 | by applicant | US3119747 | US3127325 | US4017583 | US4123498 | US5596611 | US5910971 |