EP2621697 - HYBRID DRIVE FOR A TRUCK MIXING DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Electric Hydraulics & Pneumatics Co., Ltd. No. 2188 Xin Zhu Road Shanghai 200237 / CN | [2014/19] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Sauer-Danfoss GmbH & Co. OHG Krokamp 35 24539 Neumünster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KROSCHEL, Bert Bgm-Würzbach-Allee 7 23795 Klein Rönnau / DE | 02 /
HERGT, Joachim Am Maisfeld 19 22941 Bargteheide / DE | 03 /
JAKUBOVIC, Jan Jura Hronca 3415/4 01015 Zilina / SK | 04 /
KRISSAK, Peter Limbova 3058/19 01007 Zilina / SK | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/40] |
Former [2013/32] | Erhardt, Martin Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11764549.9 | 04.10.2011 | WO2011EP67322 | Priority number, date | DE20101047314 | 01.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010047314 | [2013/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042063 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621697 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/42, B60P3/16 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B28C5/4213 (EP,US);
B28C5/1856 (US);
Y10T74/19056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Title | German: | HYBRIDANTRIEB FÜR FAHRMISCHERTROMMEL | [2013/32] | English: | HYBRID DRIVE FOR A TRUCK MIXING DRUM | [2013/32] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT HYBRIDE POUR TAMBOUR MÉLANGEUR DE BÉTONNIÈRE | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/47] | 12.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3053044 (FRED GRESTY) [X] 1,9,10 * column 1, line 10 - line 15; figure 1 * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 15 * [I] 5; | [A]US4542990 (FOUQUET JEAN-CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 56 - column 9, line 57; figures 1-4 *; | [AD]JP2003301802 (KAYABA INDUSTRY CO LTD) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]JP2007245758 (TONNERU NO RENTAL KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JP2007276418 (CHIBA SHIGEZO) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US3053044 | US4542990 | DE3539550 | JP2003301802 | DE102008017350 | DE202009001416U |