EP2556662 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SOUND REPRODUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/35] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2015/32] | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLOW, Timothy J. 42 Hale Road Farnham Surrey GU9 9QH / GB | 02 /
KÄRKKÄINEN, Leo Mikko Johannes Runeberginkatu 17 B 27 00100 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
RADIVOJEVIC, Zoran 98 Perne Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB1 3RR / GB | 04 /
OZCAN, Koray 5 Tarragon Close Farnborough GU14 9XF / GB | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [2019/35] |
Former [2013/07] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 11765128.1 | 24.03.2011 | [2019/35] | WO2011FI50247 | Priority number, date | US20100798732 | 08.04.2010 Original published format: US 798732 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011124750 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556662 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2556662 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 13.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64, H04R7/04, H04R7/10, G06F1/16, H04R1/02, H04R17/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G06F1/1605 (EP,US);
H04R1/025 (US);
G06F1/1688 (EP,US);
H04N5/642 (EP,US);
H04R17/00 (US);
H04R2499/15 (US)
|
Former IPC [2013/07] | H04N5/64, H04R7/04, H04R7/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHALLWIEDERGABE | [2013/07] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SOUND REPRODUCTION | [2013/07] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA REPRODUCTION DE SON | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 19.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.05.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2011 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | ES | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | IT | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | IE | 24.03.2020 | LU | 24.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IE | 24.03.2020 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
LU | 24.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
ES | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001002865 (LIPPONEN MARKKU [FI], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]JP2005117267 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,9,11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1, 3-5 * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0092]; figures 9a-11 * [I] 2-5,10,13; | [A]US2005221867 (ZUREK ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 5-7 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1-4 ** paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092]; figures 5, 7-15 *; | [XI]WO2009116800 (PARK SEUNG-MIN [KR]) [X] 1,9-12,14 * abstract * [I] 2-8,13,15; | [P]EP2268012 (PARK SEUNG-MIN [KR]) [P] * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012]; figures 1-7 * | International search | [A]US6427017 (TOKI NOZOMI [JP]); | [A]US2003002697 (MELLOW TIMOTHY [GB]); | [A]US2006012559 (KANG CHUNG-GU [KR]); | [A]US2008085019 (WAGENAARS WILHELMUS MARIA [BE], et al) | Examination | - MICHAEL RETTINGER, "Sound Transmission Through Perforated Screens", S.M.P.T.E. JOURNAL,, (19821201), vol. 91, no. 12, pages 1171 - 1174, XP001391398 | by applicant | JPH0276400 | US2001002865 | GB2360901 | JP2005117267 | US2005226455 | WO2006038176 | EP1827057 | JP2007300578 | EP1912469 | US7372110 | WO2009017278 | WO2009116800 |