EP2557237 - CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Tierra Co., Ltd. 1-2, Sasagaoka, Minakuchicho Koka-shi, Shiga 528-0061 / JP | [2017/14] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 5-1, Koraku 2-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-0004 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIMURA, Shougo c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Hajime c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | 03 /
TABETA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | [2017/45] |
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
KIMURA, Shougo c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650, Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHII, Hajime c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
TABETA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
Former [2013/07] | 01 /
KIMURA, Shougo c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHII, Hajime c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | |||
03 /
TABETA, Hiroshi c/o Intellectual Property Department Tsuchiura Works Hitachi Construction Machinery Co. Ltd. 650 Kandatsumachi Tsuchiura-shi Ibaraki 300-0013 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2017/45] |
Former [2013/07] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11765317.0 | 11.03.2011 | [2017/45] | WO2011JP55799 | Priority number, date | JP20100087719 | 06.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010087719 | [2013/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011125415 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2557237 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2557237 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/16, B60H1/00, E02F3/32, E02F9/08 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
B60H1/00564 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00378 (EP,KR,US);
B60H1/00 (KR);
B60H1/244 (EP);
E02F3/325 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/0858 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/07] | E02F9/16, B60H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUMASCHINE | [2013/07] | English: | CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2013/07] | French: | MACHINE DE CONSTRUCTION | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2012 | Translation filed | 06.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2011 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | IE | 11.03.2018 | LU | 11.03.2018 | MT | 11.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
MT | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
IE | 11.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
LU | 11.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1722038 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0024] - [0030]; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]US4344356 (CASTERTON ROBERT H, et al) [Y] 1-5 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4874036 (MASUDA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, lines 26-63; figures 3,4 * | International search | [Y]WO2004078562 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2007196944 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD); | [Y]WO2009022510 (HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2001071736 |