EP2560379 - CONTENT SEARCH DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.02.2015 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA Kazumasa c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA Kenji c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI Yoshihiro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [2014/18] |
Former [2013/08] | Mills, Julia, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11765644.7 | 30.03.2011 | WO2011JP58022 | Priority number, date | JP20100090610 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010090610 | [2013/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011125744 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560379 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/472, H04N5/76, G06F17/30, H04N5/91, H04N5/93, H04N7/173 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (KR);
G06F16/50 (US);
G06F16/5838 (EP,US);
G06F16/5854 (US);
G06F16/738 (EP,US);
G06F16/785 (EP,US);
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N21/431 (KR);
H04N21/440263 (EP,US);
H04N21/47217 (EP,US);
H04N21/4828 (EP,US);
H04N21/8153 (EP,US);
H04N21/84 (EP,US);
H04N21/8456 (EP,US);
H04N5/93 (KR);
H04N7/17318 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | H04N5/76, G06F17/30, H04N5/91, H04N5/93, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | INHALTSSUCHVORRICHTUNG, -VERFAHREN UND -PROGRAMM | [2013/08] | English: | CONTENT SEARCH DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF, PROCÉDÉ ET PROGRAMME DE RECHERCHE DE CONTENU | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2012 | Translation filed | 24.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 09.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/12] | 20.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5537528 (TAKAHASHI JUNICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 49 * * column 7, line 24 - column 8, line 37 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 18 *; | [X]US2007237360 (IRIE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] ** paragraph [0045] *; | [I]US2009083814 (SEKINE MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0084] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0102] * | International search | [Y]JP2007052564 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007281858 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [Y]JP2009163644 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JPH0767073 | JP2001238154 |