EP2557478 - PORTABLE INFORMATION DISPLAY TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2013/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASAKI, Yasuo c/o Funai Electric Co. Ltd. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | 02 /
KOHNO, Sei c/o Funai Electric Co. Ltd. 7-1 Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka 574-0013 / JP | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11765895.5 | 05.04.2011 | WO2011JP58572 | Priority number, date | JP20100088053 | 06.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010088053 | [2013/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011125995 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2557478 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, H04N5/00 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
G06F1/3206 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (KR);
G06F1/1626 (EP,US);
G09F9/00 (KR);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | TRAGBARES INFORMATIONSANZEIGEENDGERÄT | [2013/07] | English: | PORTABLE INFORMATION DISPLAY TERMINAL | [2013/07] | French: | TERMINAL D'AFFICHAGE D'INFORMATIONS PORTABLE | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2012 | Translation filed | 06.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 09.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2007128266 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2002055177 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003345390 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007180881 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2006101041 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [A]JP2000037045 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) | by applicant | JP2009139772 |