EP2556052 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SULFUR-CONTAINING AMINO ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2013/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAGIYA, Koji 5-4-405 Gakuen-cho Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-0833 / JP | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11766030.8 | 05.04.2011 | WO2011JP58958 | Priority number, date | JP20110030606 | 16.02.2011 Original published format: JP 2011030606 | JP20100087563 | 06.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010087563 | [2013/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011126130 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2556052 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/58, C07C319/20, C07B61/00 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
C07C319/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/20, C07C323/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG SCHWEFELHALTIGER AMINOSÄUREN | [2013/07] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SULFUR-CONTAINING AMINO ACIDS | [2013/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDES AMINÉS SULFURÉS | [2013/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 10.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009524615 (EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH); | [A]JP2009292796 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]JPS4739022 (ASAHI KASEI CORPORATION); | [A]JP2008290978 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) | [A] - J.E. LIVAK, JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (194512), vol. 67, no. 12, pages 2218 - 2220, XP002429080 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01228a050 |