EP2552942 - FACTOR H BINDING PROTEINS (FHBP) WITH ALTERED PROPERTIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Children's Hospital & Research Center at Oakland 747 52nd Street Oakland, CA 94609 / US | [2015/03] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Children's Hospital & Research Center at Oakland 747 52nd Street Oakland, CA 94609 / US | ||
For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEERNINK, Peter T. 3158 Lippizaner Lane Walnut Creek California 94598 / US | 02 /
GRANOFF, Dan M. 1085 Creston Road Berkeley California 95708 / US | 03 /
PAJON FEYT, Rolando 31 Monterey Ct. Novato California 94945 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2017/52] |
Former [2013/06] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 11766478.9 | 29.03.2011 | [2017/52] | WO2011US30400 | Priority number, date | US20110440227P | 07.02.2011 Original published format: US 440227 P | US20100423757P | 16.12.2010 Original published format: US 423757 P | US20100381025P | 08.09.2010 Original published format: US 381025 P | US20100334542P | 13.05.2010 Original published format: US 334542 P | US20100319181P | 30.03.2010 Original published format: US 319181 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011126863 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552942 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552942 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, A61K39/00 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A61K39/095 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/22 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
G01N33/68 (CN);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAKTOR-H-BINDENDE PROTEINE (FHBP) MIT GEÄNDERTEN EIGENSCHAFTEN UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/06] | English: | FACTOR H BINDING PROTEINS (FHBP) WITH ALTERED PROPERTIES AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2013/06] | French: | PROTÉINES DE LIAISON DU FACTEUR H (FHBP) AVEC DES PROPRIÉTÉS ALTÉRÉES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 09.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 11.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17199760.4 / EP3327028 | EP22155506.3 / EP4036104 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 11.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2011 | AL | 27.12.2017 | AT | 27.12.2017 | CY | 27.12.2017 | CZ | 27.12.2017 | DK | 27.12.2017 | EE | 27.12.2017 | FI | 27.12.2017 | HR | 27.12.2017 | LT | 27.12.2017 | LV | 27.12.2017 | MC | 27.12.2017 | MK | 27.12.2017 | PL | 27.12.2017 | PT | 27.12.2017 | RO | 27.12.2017 | RS | 27.12.2017 | SE | 27.12.2017 | SI | 27.12.2017 | SK | 27.12.2017 | SM | 27.12.2017 | BG | 27.03.2018 | NO | 27.03.2018 | GR | 28.03.2018 | LU | 29.03.2018 | MT | 29.03.2018 | CH | 31.03.2018 | LI | 31.03.2018 | IS | 27.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
MK | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | HU | 29.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SE | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.03.2011 | |
AT | 27.12.2017 | ||
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
PT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
MT | 29.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SI | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
CH | 31.03.2018 | ||
LI | 31.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
LU | 29.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
MC | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
DK | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RO | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 27.12.2017 | |
CY | 27.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
IS | 27.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 27.12.2017 | |
CZ | 27.12.2017 | ||
EE | 27.12.2017 | ||
FI | 27.12.2017 | ||
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
PL | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
SK | 27.12.2017 | ||
SM | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
LV | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
BG | 27.03.2018 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
HR | 27.12.2017 | ||
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
RS | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | ||
GR | 28.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 27.12.2017 | |
LT | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03063766 (WYETH CORP [US], et al); | [XD]WO2004048404 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al); | [X]US2004167068 (ZLOTNICK GARY W [US], et al); | [X]WO2006024954 (CHIRON SRL [IT], et al); | [X]WO2006081259 (CHILDRENS HOSP & RES CT OAK [US], et al); | [X]WO2007060548 (NOVARTIS VACCINES & DIAGNOSTIC [IT], et al) | International search | [Y]WO2009114485 (CHILDRENS HOSP & RES CT OAK [US], et al); |