EP2606278 - CONTINUOUS FLOW STEAM GENERATOR HAVING AN INTEGRATED REHEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRÜCKNER, Jan Habernhofer Weg 30 91080 Uttenreuth / DE | 02 /
FRANKE, Joachim An der Fleischbrücke 1 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 11766953.1 | 29.09.2011 | WO2011EP66966 | Priority number, date | DE20101041903 | 04.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010041903 | [2013/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012045650 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2606278 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/00 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F01K7/22 (EP,US);
F03G6/005 (US);
F03G6/067 (EP,US);
F22B1/006 (EP,US);
F22B1/06 (EP,US);
F22B29/06 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | DURCHLAUFDAMPFERZEUGER MIT INTEGRIERTEM ZWISCHENÜBERHITZER | [2013/26] | English: | CONTINUOUS FLOW STEAM GENERATOR HAVING AN INTEGRATED REHEATER | [2013/26] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE VAPEUR CONTINU À SURCHAUFFEUR INTERMÉDIAIRE INTÉGRÉ | [2013/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 14.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/51] | 16.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19736888 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,8-10 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0881429 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * column 4, line 15 - line 43; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19907451 (ABB ALSTOM POWER CH AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,6 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 1 * * column 5, line 36 - line 45 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 2 * * figures 1,6,8 *; | [A]WO2009129170 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH], et al) [A] 11-13 * paragraphs [0014] , [0016] - [0018]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2187051 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 11-13* figure 1 * | Examination | DE19545308 | WO2010025960 |