EP2632581 - METHOD OF MAKING SOLID BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Midatech Pharma (Wales) Limited Oddfellows House 19 Newport Road Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB | [2015/17] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states Q Chip Limited 36A Park Place Cardiff CF10 3BB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Daniel 34 Hirwain Street Cathays Cardiff CF24 4JH / GB | 02 /
SHADICK, Owen 6 Lauriston Close Caerau Cardiff CF5 5PT / GB | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Abel & Imray LLP Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/10] | Abel & Imray Westpoint Building James Street West Bath BA1 2DA / GB | ||
Former [2013/36] | Haslam, Simon David, et al Abel & Imray 20, Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11767292.3 | 30.09.2011 | [2020/10] | WO2011GB51859 | Priority number, date | GB20100016436 | 30.09.2010 Original published format: GB 201016436 | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042274 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632581 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2632581 | Date: | 04.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/06, B01J2/08, B01J2/18 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B01J2/08 (EP,US);
B01J2/06 (US);
B01J2/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/36] | B01J2/08, B01J2/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG FESTER KÜGELCHEN | [2013/36] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING SOLID BEADS | [2013/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PERLES SOLIDES | [2013/36] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/36] | 17.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 27.04.2017 | [2017/35] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2011 | AL | 04.03.2020 | CY | 04.03.2020 | EE | 04.03.2020 | HR | 04.03.2020 | LT | 04.03.2020 | LV | 04.03.2020 | MC | 04.03.2020 | MK | 04.03.2020 | MT | 04.03.2020 | RO | 04.03.2020 | RS | 04.03.2020 | SI | 04.03.2020 | SK | 04.03.2020 | SM | 04.03.2020 | BG | 04.06.2020 | GR | 05.06.2020 | IS | 04.07.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | LU | 30.09.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
AL | 04.03.2020 | ||
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.09.2011 | |
CY | 04.03.2020 | ||
EE | 04.03.2020 | ||
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
MT | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
LU | 30.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
MC | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SI | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 04.03.2020 | |
HR | 04.03.2020 | ||
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SK | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RO | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
SM | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LT | 04.03.2020 | ||
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
IS | 04.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
BG | 04.06.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | ||
GR | 05.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 04.03.2020 | |
LV | 04.03.2020 | ||
RS | 04.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3845179 (WACE P) [X] 1-43 * column 4, paragraph 5; figure 1; claim 1 * [I] 44-47; | [I]US5500162 (THEISEN WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [I] 1-47* column 1, paragraph 5; figure 3; claims 1,5 * | Examination | WO2010004253 | by applicant | US2007196416 |