EP2599184 - MULTI-LOOP WIRELESS POWER RECEIVE COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOW, Zhen Ning 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
WHEATLEY, Charles E., III 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Reedy, Orlaith, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 11767314.5 | 26.07.2011 | WO2011US45410 | Priority number, date | US20100965685 | 10.12.2010 Original published format: US 965685 | US20100368584P | 28.07.2010 Original published format: US 368584 P | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012015839 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2599184 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/02, H01F38/14 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
H01F38/14 (EP,US);
H02J50/12 (EP,KR,US);
H01F21/12 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/40 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/60 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/90 (EP,KR,US);
H02J7/02 (US);
H02M3/156 (KR);
H04B5/24 (EP,US);
H04B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04B5/48 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE MULTI-LOOP-LEISTUNGSAUFNAHMESPULE | [2013/23] | English: | MULTI-LOOP WIRELESS POWER RECEIVE COIL | [2013/23] | French: | BOBINE DE RÉCEPTION DE PUISSANCE SANS FIL À BOUCLES MULTIPLES | [2013/23] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 27.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0654802 (IKEDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-40 * column 6, line 3 - column 9, line 30; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO03052780 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-40* page 17, line 11 - page 18, line 18; figure 8 *; | [Y]WO2009037380 (ITKONEN MAIJA [FI]) [Y] 1-40 * page 10, paragraph 37 - page 11, paragraph 39; figures 3,6a,6b * | Examination | US2005068146 | by applicant | US19840613685 | US20100965685 |