EP2619070 - PLASTIC REINFORCED METTALLIC ROOF BOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-bosch Strasse 38 6700/ludwigshafen 67056 Rheinland-Pfalz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUEGER, David 8779 Voigt Avenue Grosse Ile MI 48138 / US | 02 /
EL-KHATIB, Fadi, A. P.O. Box 72638 Abu Dhabi / AE | 03 /
ZHANG, Marco 48974 Woodson Way Canton MI 48187 / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Altmann Stößel Dick Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11767521.5 | 22.09.2011 | WO2011US52781 | Priority number, date | US20100385361P | 22.09.2010 Original published format: US 385361 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012040480 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2619070 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/06, B62D29/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
B62D25/06 (EP,KR,US);
B62D29/00 (KR);
B62D29/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | DACHSPRIEGEL | [2013/31] | English: | PLASTIC REINFORCED METTALLIC ROOF BOW | [2013/31] | French: | TRAVERSE DE TOIT EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE RENFORCEE | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 05.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 12.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0995668 (BAYER AG [DE]) [I] 1-5,13-19,27,28 * paragraphs [0044] , [0049] , [ 057]; figures 1,8; claims 1,16 *; | [X]DE10163822 (BENTELER AUTOMOBILTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,13-15,27,28* figures 1,2; claims 2,3 *; | [XY]WO2006091794 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,10-15,24-28 * paragraphs [0019] , [0027]; claim 12 * [Y] 2-5,16-19; | [I]EP1714855 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [I] 1,2,13-16,27,28 * figures 1,2; claims 5,6 *; | [Y]US2007262617 (FEITH THOMAS [DE], et al) [Y] 2-5,16-19 * paragraph [0028]; figure 7 *; | [XA]DE202008015399U (LANXESS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,13-15,25-28 * paragraphs [0005] , [0126]; figure 1,; claims 1,5 * [A] 2,16 |