EP2621603 - CANISTER FILTER SYSTEM WITH DRAIN THAT COOPERATES WITH FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 510 Lake Cook Road Suite 100 Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | For all designated states Advanced Filtration Systems, INC. 3206 Farber Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | [2019/36] |
Former [2019/30] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 410 Lake Cook Road, Suite 100 Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | ||
For all designated states Advanced Filtration Systems, INC. 3206 Farber Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | |||
For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | |||
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria, IL 61626-9510 / US | ||
For all designated states Advanced Filtration Systems, INC. 3206 Farber Drive Champaign, IL 61822 / US | |||
For all designated states Donaldson Company, Inc. 1400 West 94th Street Bloomington, MN 55431 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLOTT, Mark, T. 7021 South Gerdes Road Mapleton, IL 61547 / US | 02 /
OFORI-AMOAH, David 1120 North LaSalle Street 18E Chicago, IL 60610 / US | 03 /
SALVADOR, Christopher, J. 11217 North Oakwood Drive Unit 2 Peoria, IL 60615 / US | 04 /
HEIBENTHAL, Randall, W. 604 S. Oak Drive Mahomet, IL 61853 / US | 05 /
DEEDRICH, Dennis, M. 2300 Valleybrook Champaign, IL 61822 / US | 06 /
HARDER, David, B. 1713 Commonwealth Drive Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | 07 /
HACKER, John, R. 5617 Harriet Ave S. Minneapolis, MN 55419 / US | 08 /
EISENMENGER, Richard, J. P.O. Box 318 305 Emerald Lane Philo, IL 61864 / US | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2019/30] |
Former [2013/32] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11767556.1 | 28.09.2011 | [2019/30] | WO2011US53554 | Priority number, date | US20100896555 | 01.10.2010 Original published format: US 896555 | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012044636 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621603 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621603 | Date: | 24.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/153, B01D35/16 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B01D35/153 (EP,US);
B01D35/30 (US);
B01D27/00 (RU);
B01D29/11 (RU);
B01D35/16 (EP,US);
F01M1/10 (RU);
| C-Set: |
B01D35/153, B01D35/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANISTERFILTERSYSTEM MIT EINEM AN EIN FILTERELEMENT GEKOPPELTEN AUSLASS | [2013/32] | English: | CANISTER FILTER SYSTEM WITH DRAIN THAT COOPERATES WITH FILTER ELEMENT | [2013/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FILTRE À CARTOUCHE MUNI D'UN DRAIN COOPÉRANT AVEC L'ÉLÉMENT FILTRANT | [2013/32] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 03.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.01.2019 | 25.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 24.07.2019 | CY | 24.07.2019 | EE | 24.07.2019 | HR | 24.07.2019 | LT | 24.07.2019 | LV | 24.07.2019 | MC | 24.07.2019 | MK | 24.07.2019 | MT | 24.07.2019 | PL | 24.07.2019 | RS | 24.07.2019 | SE | 24.07.2019 | SI | 24.07.2019 | SK | 24.07.2019 | SM | 24.07.2019 | IE | 28.09.2019 | LU | 28.09.2019 | PT | 25.11.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
MT | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
CY | 24.07.2019 | ||
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SI | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
IE | 28.09.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
LU | 28.09.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
SM | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
MC | 24.07.2019 | ||
PL | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
SK | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
EE | 24.07.2019 | ||
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 24.07.2019 | |
HR | 24.07.2019 | ||
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | HR | 24.07.2019 | |
LT | 24.07.2019 | ||
LV | 24.07.2019 | ||
RS | 24.07.2019 | ||
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 24.07.2019 | |
SE | 24.07.2019 | ||
PT | 25.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008308481 (WIECZOREK MARK [US], et al) [A] 1-10* figure 1 *; | [XI]DE202008013578U (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 8,10 * the whole document * [I] 1-7,9 | by applicant | US6814243 |