EP2560207 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKAJIMA Nami c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
FUJIWARA Masahiro c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11768962.0 | 15.04.2011 | WO2011JP59410 | Priority number, date | JP20100095136 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010095136 | [2013/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011129441 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2560207 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, G02F1/1368, H01L27/14, // G02F1/1333, G06F3/042 | [2014/41] | CPC: |
H01L27/14678 (EP,US);
G02F1/1368 (EP,US);
G06F3/042 (EP,US);
H01L27/14645 (EP,US);
G02F1/13338 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | H01L27/146, G02F1/1368, H01L27/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2013/08] | English: | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF À SEMICONDUCTEUR | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2012 | Translation filed | 26.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 13.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1394859 (TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TEC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0070] * * figures 1-17 *; | [Y]US2005017318 (ISHIDA ARICHIKA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0109] * * figures 14-28 *; | [A]US2007109435 (TAKAHASHI MITSUASA [JP]) [A] 10-12 * paragraphs [0043] , [0048] * * figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2008073653 (IWASAKI TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0118] * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2006238135 (KIMURA HAJIME [JP]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2008132862 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2010038419 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2009144915 (SHARP KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2009010125 (SHARP KK); | [A]JP2007072242 (SANYO EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CO); | [AP]JP2010177362 (SHARP KK); | [AP]JP2011076023 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | WO2008132862 | JP2005275644 | JP2009230222 | WO2011040090 | WO2011040091 | WO2011040093 |