EP2558236 - COUPLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnsen, Anders Sunnanö 287 781 94 Borlänge / SE | [2017/18] |
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Johnsen, Anders Alderbacken 72 781 93 Borlange / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Löfgren, Jonas, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Löfgren, Jonas, et al Bjerkéns Patentbyrå KB Box 1274 801 37 Gävle / SE | Application number, filing date | 11769169.1 | 11.04.2011 | WO2011SE50435 | Priority number, date | SE20100000376 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: SE 1000376 | [2013/08] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011129751 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2558236 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B23B31/107, B28D1/14, B23B31/00, B28D7/00 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
B28D7/00 (EP,US);
B23B31/1071 (EP,SE,US);
B23B31/006 (EP,US);
B23B31/22 (SE,US);
B28D1/14 (SE);
B23B2231/026 (EP,US);
B23B2231/0264 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17701 (EP,US);
Y10T279/17717 (EP,US);
Y10T279/3493 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | B23B31/107, B23B31/22, B28D1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | KOPPLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/08] | English: | COUPLING DEVICE | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COUPLAGE | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 15.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3405950 (COX JOHN R); | [A]US3788658 (MILES W, et al); | [A]US4824298 (LIPPACHER WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [A]US2002027329 (SCHILL ALBRECHT PAUL [SE], et al) | International search | [A]US1636421 (KNOTT WARREN E); | [A]US3405950 (COX JOHN R); | [A]US3583715 (JAHRL ERIC); | [A]DE3744092 (HILTI AG [LI]) |