EP2558344 - MAGNETIC-ASSISTED LINEAR BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricon Corp. 7900 Nelson Road Panorama City, CA 91402 / US | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANS, Simon 58 Washford Road Hilton Derbyshire DE65 5HN / GB | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 11769231.9 | 17.02.2011 | WO2011US25221 | Priority number, date | US20100759860 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: US 759860 | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011129918 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2558344 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 12.01.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B61D19/02, E05D15/06 | [2017/45] | CPC: |
E05D15/0647 (EP,US);
F16C39/063 (EP,US);
E05D2015/0695 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/46 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/64 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | B61D19/02, E05D15/06, E05F15/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | 10.10.2012 | ME | 10.10.2012 | Title | German: | MAGNETISCH GESTEUERTES LINEARLAGER | [2013/08] | English: | MAGNETIC-ASSISTED LINEAR BEARING | [2013/08] | French: | DOUILLE À BILLES À ASSISTANCE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.2012 | Search fee paid | 10.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 25.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2017 | 28.02.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5907890 (REDAELLI GIANFRANCO [IT]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4016948 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 41 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]EP1217160 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * figures 1-4 * | International search | [A]EP1217161 (INVENTIO AG [CH]); | [A]JPH06329375 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]US4473259 (GOLDOWSKY MICHAEL P [US]); | [A]EP1217160 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) | by applicant | US5907890 | US4698876 | US7013605 |