EP2558177 - ANTICOAGULANT-FREE DIALYSIS SYSTEMS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2017 [2017/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Holdings, Inc. 920 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2013/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HO, Chih-Hu 276 E. Lucky Star Way Farmington UT 84025 / US | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/08] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11769599.9 | 14.04.2011 | WO2011US32519 | Priority number, date | US20100324570P | 15.04.2010 Original published format: US 324570 P | [2013/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011130528 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2558177 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/00, B01D61/00, C02F1/44 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
A61M1/3672 (EP,US);
A61K31/722 (EP,US);
A61K31/734 (EP,US);
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
A61M1/341 (EP,US);
A61M1/3437 (EP,US);
A61M1/3458 (EP,US);
A61M1/36 (EP,US);
A61M1/3673 (EP,US);
A61M1/3675 (EP,US);
B01D61/28 (EP,US);
B01D67/0093 (EP,US);
B01D71/68 (EP,US);
B01D71/76 (EP,US);
A61M1/34 (EP,US);
A61M1/3455 (EP,US);
A61M1/3679 (EP,US);
B01D2323/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Title | German: | DIALYSESYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN OHNE GERINNUNGSVERHINDERUNGSMITTEL | [2013/08] | English: | ANTICOAGULANT-FREE DIALYSIS SYSTEMS AND METHODS | [2013/08] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET MÉTHODES DE DIALYSE SANS ANTICOAGULANTS | [2013/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/17] | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6524482 (BRUENING RONALD L [US], et al); | [Y]US2005061742 (BRADY JAMES A [US], et al) |