EP2619791 - INTEGRATED PASSIVES AND POWER AMPLIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Mems Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACK, Justin, Phelps 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
SHENOY, Ravindra, V. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
GOUSEV, Evgeni, Petrovich 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
HADJICHRISTOS, Aristotele 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
MYERS, Thomas, Andrew 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
KIM, Jonghae 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 07 /
VELEZ, Mario, Francisco 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 08 /
LAN, Je-Hsiung, Jeffrey 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 09 /
LO, Chi, Shun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/31] | 01 /
BLACK, Justin, Phelps 2581 Junction Avenue San Jose, California 95134 / US | ||
02 /
SHENOY, Ravindra, V. 2581 Junction Avenue San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
03 /
GOUSEV, Evgeni, Petrovich 2581 Junction Avenue San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
04 /
HADJICHRISTOS, Aristotele 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
05 /
MYERS, Thomas, Andrew 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
06 /
KIM, Jonghae 2581 Junction Avenue San Jose, California 95134 / US | |||
07 /
VELEZ, Mario, Francisco 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
08 /
LAN, Je-Hsiung, Jeffrey 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | |||
09 /
LO, Chi, Shun 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/31] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11770223.3 | 16.09.2011 | [2015/43] | WO2011US52017 | Priority number, date | US20100385913P | 23.09.2010 Original published format: US 385913 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012040063 | Date: | 29.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2619791 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2619791 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/31, G02B26/00, H01L21/56 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G02B26/001 (EP,US);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/1461, H01L2924/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2013/31] | H01L21/56, G02B26/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER PASSIVE ELEMENTE UND LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER | [2013/31] | English: | INTEGRATED PASSIVES AND POWER AMPLIFIER | [2013/31] | French: | DISPOSITIFS PASSIFS ET AMPLIFICATEUR DE PUISSANCE INTÉGRÉS | [2013/31] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 17.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2011 | AL | 21.10.2015 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 16.09.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2002064029 (POHJONEN HELENA [FI]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-9 * [Y] 3,7-49; | [Y]WO2006134214 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 3,7-49 * page 9, line 24 - page 17, line 12; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2009309662 (YANG KI SEOK [US], et al) [Y] 3,7-49 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1, 7 *; | [Y]WO2009076075 (QUALCOMM MEMS TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 13-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0088]; figures 6A,6B; claims 1,31-35 * | by applicant | US2002064029 |