EP2739605 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CRYSTALLINE FORM I OF AGOMELATINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorio Chimico Internazionale S.p.A. Largo Donegani Guido 2 20121 Milano / IT | [2014/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTOLINI, Giorgio c/o LABORATORIO CHIMICO INTERNAZIONALE S.p.A. Via B. Cellini 20 20090 Segrate (Ml) / IT | 02 /
DE ANGELIS, Bruno c/o LABORATORIO CHIMICO INTERNAZIONALE S.p.A. Via B. Cellini 20 20090 Segrate (Ml) / IT | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Trupiano, Federica Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [2016/17] |
Former [2014/24] | Trupiano, Federica Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 11770507.9 | 03.08.2011 | [2016/17] | WO2011IB01805 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013017903 | Date: | 07.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2739605 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2739605 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/00, C07C233/18 | [2014/24] | CPC: |
C07C233/18 (EP,US);
C07C233/25 (US);
C07C231/22 (EP,US);
C07B2200/13 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/22, C07C233/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KRISTALLINEN FORM I VON AGOMELATIN | [2014/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF CRYSTALLINE FORM I OF AGOMELATINE | [2014/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE LA FORME CRISTALLINE I DE L'AGOMÉLATINE | [2014/24] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2014 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.03.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 14.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | LU | 03.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 27.04.2016 | |
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/44] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
LU | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NO | 27.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP2319827 (RATIOPHARM GMBH [DE]) [XD] 9 * claim 1 *; | [XD] - TINANT B ET AL, "N-Ä2-(7-METHOXY-1-NAPHTHYL)ETHYLÜACETAMIDE, A POTENT MELATONIN ANALOG", ACTA CRYSTALLOGRAPHICA SECTION C. CRYSTAL STRUCTURE COMMUNICATIONS, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (19940101), vol. C50, no. 6, doi:10.1107/S0108270193012922, ISSN 0108-2701, pages 907 - 910, XP009047983 [XD] 9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1107/S0108270193012922 | [A] - Petit S. et al., "The Amorphous State", Petit S. et al., Hilfiker R. et al., Polymorphism in the Pharmaceutical Industry, Weinheim, WILEY-VCH, (2006), pages 263 - 265, ISBN 3-527-31146-7, XP002666940 [A] 1-8 * page 265, paragraph 10.3.3 * | by applicant | EP0447285 | EP1564202 | CN101704763 | EP2319827 | - ACTA CRYST., (1994), vol. C50, pages 907 - 910 | - ACTA CRYST, (1994), vol. C50, pages 907 - 910 |