EP2621388 - SYSTEM FOR TEMPERATURE FEEDBACK FOR ADAPTIVE RADIO FREQUENCY ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TEMPERATURE FEEDBACK FOR ADAPTIVE RADIO FREQUENCY ABLATION | ||
[2021/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2013/39] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DALAL, Sandeep c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
KRUECKER, Jochen c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/45] |
Former [2013/32] | 01 /
DALAL, Sandeep c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
02 /
KRUECKER, Jochen c/o High Tech Campus Building 44 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2013/32] | Steffen, Thomas Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 11770521.0 | 22.09.2011 | [2021/45] | WO2011IB54163 | Priority number, date | US20100387549P | 29.09.2010 Original published format: US 387549 P | [2013/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012042443 | Date: | 05.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2621388 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621388 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00797 (EP,US);
A61B2034/104 (EP,US);
A61B2034/2051 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | A61B18/12, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM FÜR TEMPERATURRÜCKMELDUNG FÜR ADAPTIVE HF-ABLATION | [2021/17] | English: | SYSTEM FOR TEMPERATURE FEEDBACK FOR ADAPTIVE RADIO FREQUENCY ABLATION | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INDICATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE UTILISÉ POUR UNE ABLATION ADAPTATIVE PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2021/17] |
Former [2013/32] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR TEMPERATURRÜCKMELDUNG FÜR ADAPTIVE HF-ABLATION | ||
Former [2013/32] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TEMPERATURE FEEDBACK FOR ADAPTIVE RADIO FREQUENCY ABLATION | ||
Former [2013/32] | SYSTÈME ET MÉTHODE D'INDICATION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE UTILISÉS POUR UNE ABLATION ADAPTATIVE PAR RADIOFRÉQUENCE | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/32] | 06.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2011 | AL | 10.11.2021 | AT | 10.11.2021 | CY | 10.11.2021 | CZ | 10.11.2021 | DK | 10.11.2021 | EE | 10.11.2021 | ES | 10.11.2021 | FI | 10.11.2021 | HR | 10.11.2021 | IT | 10.11.2021 | LT | 10.11.2021 | LV | 10.11.2021 | MC | 10.11.2021 | MK | 10.11.2021 | MT | 10.11.2021 | NL | 10.11.2021 | PL | 10.11.2021 | RO | 10.11.2021 | RS | 10.11.2021 | SE | 10.11.2021 | SI | 10.11.2021 | SK | 10.11.2021 | SM | 10.11.2021 | TR | 10.11.2021 | BG | 10.02.2022 | NO | 10.02.2022 | GR | 11.02.2022 | IS | 10.03.2022 | PT | 10.03.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
TR | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
MK | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CY | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 22.09.2011 | |
AL | 10.11.2021 | ||
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
IT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
MC | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SI | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 10.11.2021 | |
AT | 10.11.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
CZ | 10.11.2021 | ||
DK | 10.11.2021 | ||
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SK | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
EE | 10.11.2021 | ||
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RO | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
SM | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
NO | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
NL | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
SE | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
GR | 11.02.2022 | ||
IS | 10.03.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
ES | 10.11.2021 | ||
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
HR | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
LV | 10.11.2021 | ||
PL | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
PT | 10.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
FI | 10.11.2021 | ||
LT | 10.11.2021 | ||
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 10.11.2021 | |
RS | 10.11.2021 | ||
BG | 10.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 10.02.2022 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002077627 (JOHNSON THEODORE C [US], et al) [Y] 21,27 * column 19, lines 46-62 * * column 28, lines 34-51 *; | [A]EP1554986 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]) [A] 26-31* the whole document *; | [XY]US2009118613 (KRUGMAN KIMBERLY [US], et al) [X] 20,22,24-26,28,30,31 * paragraphs [0008] , [0020] - [0024] - [0035] - [0039]; figure 3 * [Y] 21,23,27,29; | [Y]US2010063496 (TROVATO KAREN I [US], et al) [Y] 23,29 * paragraphs [0037] - [0047] * | Examination | US5800484 | US6241725 | by applicant | US2002077627 | US2009118613 | US2010063496 |