EP2661478 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVAPORATING HYDROGEN HALIDE AND WATER FROM BIOMASS HYDROLYZATES CONTAINING HALOGEN ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Sugar AG Hermann-Grafe Str. 40 01662 Meißen / DE | [2017/37] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Green Sugar Gmbh, Produktinnovationen Aus Biomasse Hermann-Grafe-Strasse 40 01662 Meissen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSE, Frank Westerlandstrasse 17A 13189 Berlin / DE | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Matthias Rudolfstrasse 21 01097 Dresden / DE | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Gerber, Wolfgang Kaitzer Weinberg 10 01217 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Gerber, Wolfgang Rechtsanwälte Gerber - Klemm - Kurz Lockwitzer Straße 20 01219 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 11770676.2 | 12.07.2011 | WO2011DE01423 | Priority number, date | DE20101027174 | 14.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010027174 | DE201110104723 | 15.06.2011 Original published format: DE102011104723 | [2013/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012013177 | Date: | 02.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2661478 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C13K1/00, C08H8/00, B01D1/14, B01D1/16 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
B01D1/14 (EP,US);
B01D3/40 (US);
B01D1/16 (EP,US);
Y02P30/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | ME | 03.06.2013 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND APPARATUR ZUR ABDAMPFUNG VON HALOGENWASSERSTOFF UND WASSER AUS HALOGENSAUREN BIOMASSEHYDROLYSATEN | [2013/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EVAPORATING HYDROGEN HALIDE AND WATER FROM BIOMASS HYDROLYZATES CONTAINING HALOGEN ACID | [2013/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'ÉVAPORATION D'HALOGÉNURE D'HYDROGÈNE ET D'EAU À PARTIR D'HYDROLYSATS DE BIOMASSE D'ACIDE HALOGÉNOHYDRIQUE | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 03.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 08.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 03.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 03.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 03.06.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 03.06.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.10.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.01.2014 | 31.07.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2014 | 31.07.2016 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.2017 | 31.07.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 27.04.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2020/36] | 01.03.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/36] | Cited in | International search | [X]FR916382 (ECONOMISCH TECHNOLOGISH INST O) [X] 1-10 * page 3, line 84 - line 94 * * page 4, line 10 - line 17 *; | [A]US4432805 (NUUTTILA ANTTI I [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 35 *; | [A]US6007636 (LIGHTNER GENE E [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 50 *; | [A]DE102008064325 (GREEN SUGAR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 7 - page 3, paragraph 13 * | Examination | DE362230 | DE102008022242 | by applicant | DE362230 | DE102008022242 | DE20101009310 |