EP2635362 - A PROCESS FOR MAKING A FILTER BLOCK CUM SEDIMENT FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DN / GB | |||
Former [2013/37] | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Unilever NV Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:CY
GB
IE
MT
Unilever PLC Unilever House 100 Victoria Embankment London EC4Y 0DN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATTERJEE, Jaideep HINDUSTAN UNILEVER Ltd Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 02 /
GUPTA, Santosh, Kumar HINDUSTAN UNILEVER Ltd Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | 03 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Rajeesh, Kumar HINDUSTAN UNILEVER Ltd Research Centre 64 Main Road Whitefield Bangalore 560 066 / IN | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | van den Brom, Coenraad Richard Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Rosen Jacobson, Frans Lucas M. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 11770735.6 | 11.10.2011 | WO2011EP67690 | Priority number, date | EP20100195083 | 15.12.2010 Original published format: EP 10195083 | IN2010MUM3023 | 01.11.2010 Original published format: IN MU30232010 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012059299 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635362 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2635362 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, B01D39/08, B01D39/16 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
B01D39/2055 (EP);
B01D39/08 (EP);
B01D39/1623 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SEDIMENTFILTERS MIT EINGEBAUTEM FILTERBLOCK | [2013/37] | English: | A PROCESS FOR MAKING A FILTER BLOCK CUM SEDIMENT FILTER | [2013/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN BLOC DE FILTRATION COMPORTANT UN FILTRE À SÉDIMENTS | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 08.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.09.2014 | AT | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | ES | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | IT | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | IE | 11.10.2014 | LU | 11.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | FR | 03.11.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | PT | 05.01.2015 | DE | 01.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 11.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
LU | 11.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
IE | 11.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
FR | 03.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
IT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
DE | 01.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
PT | 05.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
ES | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2390987 (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [A] 1-6 * example 1 *; | [A]US6368504 (KUENNEN ROY W [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 37; figure 1; claim - *; | [A]EP2161067 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2390987 | WO2005094966 | EP2161067 |