EP2635783 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC SWITCHING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2013/37] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODRIGUEZ-AMAYA, Nestor Dennerstr. 70 70372 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
RUTHARDT, Siegfried Pfarrgartenstr. 2 71155 Altdorf / DE | 03 /
RAPP, Holger Birkenweg 22 71254 Ditzingen / DE | 04 /
STOECKLEIN, Wolfgang Haydnweg 2 71332 Waiblingen / DE | 05 /
BERGHAENEL, Bernd Kopernikusstr. 2/2 75428 Illingen / DE | 06 /
BEIER, Marco Bertastr. 31 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 11770739.8 | 12.10.2011 | WO2011EP67784 | Priority number, date | DE20101043306 | 03.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043306 | [2013/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012059305 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2635783 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/20, F02D41/24, H01F7/18 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
F02D41/20 (EP,US);
F02D41/2438 (EP,US);
F02D41/247 (EP,US);
G01R31/327 (US);
F02D2041/2055 (EP,US);
H01F2007/185 (EP,US);
H01F2007/1861 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES MAGNETISCHEN SCHALTGLIEDES | [2013/37] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A MAGNETIC SWITCHING ELEMENT | [2013/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN ORGANE DE COMMUTATION MAGNÉTIQUE | [2013/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2013 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/37] | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/46] | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1400674 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5,10* paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]DE10343211 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * * paragraphs [0023] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0045] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE102006029083 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE102005060414 (BOSCH REXROTH AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0014] , [0018] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y]DE102006029082 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] * * figures 1,2 * |