EP2625266 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Biomimetics Technologies Inc. 191 Ellis Avenue Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA | For all designated states Stolz, Marvin Leonhardtstrasse 19 14057 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Schmälzlin, Elmar Bergholzer Str. 3 14473 Potsdam / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
For all designated states Biomimetics Technologies Inc. 191 Ellis Avenue Toronto, ON M6S 2X4 / CA | |||
For all designated states Stolz, Marvin Niehbuhrstr. 71 10629 Berlin / DE | |||
For all designated states Schmälzlin, Elmar Bergholzer Str. 3 14473 Potsdam / DE | |||
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
For all designated states Biomimetics Technologies Inc. 191 Ellis Avenue Toronto ON M6S 2X4 / CA | |||
For all designated states Stolz, Marvin Niehbuhrstr. 71 10629 Berlin / DE | |||
For all designated states Schmälzlin, Elmar Bergholzer Str. 3 14473 Potsdam / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMÄLZLIN, Elmar Bergholzer Str. 3 14473 Potsdam / DE | 02 /
WEYAND, Birgit Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | 03 /
ISRAELOWITZ, Meir 1010 Brodview Avenue Apt. 606 M4K 2R8 / CA | 04 /
VOGT, Peter Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | 05 /
REIMERS, Kerstin Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | 06 /
VON SCHROEDER, Herbert, P. 191 Ellis Avenue M6S 2X4 Toronto, ON / CA | 07 /
GILLE, Christoph Junostrasse 6d 13467 Berlin / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/33] | 01 /
SCHMÄLZLIN, Elmar Bergholzer Str. 3 14473 Potsdam / DE | ||
02 /
WEYAND, Birgit Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | |||
03 /
ISRAELOWITZ, Meir Toronto Ontario / CA | |||
04 /
VOGT, Peter Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | |||
05 /
REIMERS, Kerstin Carl-Neuberg-Str. 1 30625 Hannover / DE | |||
06 /
VON SCHROEDER, Herbert, P. Toronto Ontario / CA | |||
07 /
GILLE, Christoph Toronto Ontario / CA | Representative(s) | Taruttis, Stefan Georg TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b 30159 Hannover / DE | [2013/33] | Application number, filing date | 11771065.7 | 04.10.2011 | [2016/39] | WO2011EP67344 | Priority number, date | US20100404320P | 04.10.2010 Original published format: US 404320 P | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012045756 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2625266 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2625266 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2625266 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q3/00, G01N33/84, C12N5/0775, C12N5/00 | [2016/20] | CPC: |
C12N5/0062 (EP,US);
C12N5/0662 (US);
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
C12N5/0664 (EP,US);
C12N5/0665 (EP,US);
C12N5/0666 (EP,US);
C12N5/0667 (EP,US);
C12N5/0668 (EP,US);
C12Q3/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2013/33] | C12N5/00, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DREIDIMENSIONALEM GEWEBE | [2013/33] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THREE-DIMENSIONAL TISSUE | [2013/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN TISSU TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 08.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | IE | 04.10.2016 | LU | 04.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 04.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 04.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004171094 (KLIMANT INGO [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * claims 5, 6 * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * [Y] 1-17; | [XY]US2005058842 (LIEBMANN-VINSON ANDREA [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraphs [0030] - [0035] * * claims 1, 25, 30, 31 *[Y] 1-17; | [XY] - ACOSTA M A ET AL, "Fluorescent microparticles for sensing cell microenvironment oxygen levels within 3D scaffolds", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 30, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2009.02.021, ISSN 0142-9612, (20090601), pages 3068 - 3074, (20090314), XP026933211 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2009.02.021 | [XY] - PETER C. THOMAS ET AL, "A Noninvasive Thin Film Sensor for Monitoring Oxygen Tension during in Vitro Cell Culture", ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (20091115), vol. 81, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ac9013379, ISSN 0003-2700, pages 9239 - 9246, XP055019142 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * [Y] 1-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ac9013379 | Examination | - CHOU PI-TAI ET AL, "Phosphorescent dyes for organic light-emitting diodes.", CHEMISTRY (WEINHEIM AN DER BERGSTRASSE, GERMANY) 2007, (2007), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 380 - 395 | - WANG XU-DONG ET AL, "Optical methods for sensing and imaging oxygen: materials, spectroscopies and applications.", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS 21 MAY 2014, (20140521), vol. 43, no. 10, ISSN 1460-4744, pages 3666 - 3761 | by applicant | EP2031501 | - SCHMALZLIN ET AL., SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, (2006), pages 251 - 254 |