EP2562591 - DISPLAY DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORIWAKI, Hiroyuki c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11771718.1 | 06.04.2011 | WO2011JP02045 | Priority number, date | JP20100095879 | 19.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010095879 | [2013/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011132374 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562591 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1339 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G02F1/1339 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133388 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F1/133707 (EP,US);
G02F1/1345 (EP,US);
H01L23/295 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2013/09] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2013/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2012 | Translation filed | 20.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 20.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 20.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6018380 (HU DYI-CHUNG [TW], et al) [X] 1,5-7,10,14,15 * abstract * * column 2, line 9 - line 20 * * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 39 * [I] 2-4,8,9,11-13; | [I]US2001046007 (GREENE RAYMOND G [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0072] - [0074] - [0 93] , [ 100] - [0103] *; | [A]US6466294 (YAMAGISHI NOBUYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2006194920 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]JP2002196697 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JP2001005005 (SONY CORP) | by applicant | JP2007322627 | JP2008145461 |