EP2561573 - SOLUBLE OXYGEN EVOLVING CATALYSTS FOR RECHARGEABLE METAL-AIR BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liox Power, Inc. 129 North Hill Road Suite 103 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | [2020/13] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states Liox Power, Inc. 129 North Hill Road Suite 103 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHASE, Gregory, V. 129 N Hill Avenue Suite 103 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 02 /
ZECEVIC, Strahinja 14642 Buckingham Place Tustin, CA 92780 / US | 03 /
WALKER, Wesley 905 Robinson Street Los Angeles, CA 90026 / US | 04 /
UDDIN, Jasim 125 S. Holliston Avenue Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 05 /
SASAKI, Kenji, A. 600 N Wilson Avenue Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 06 /
GIORDANI, Vincent 2816 Waverly Drive Los Angeles, CA 90039 / US | 07 /
BRYANTSEV, Vyacheslav 110 S. Michigan Avenue, Apt. 19 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 08 /
BLANCO, Mario 9961 Workman Avenue Temple City, CA 91780 / US | 09 /
ADDISON, Dan, D. 129N Hill Ave. Suite 103 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | [2013/20] |
Former [2013/09] | 01 /
CHASE, Gregory, V. 129 N Hill Avenue Suite 103 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | ||
02 /
ZECEVIC, Strahinja 14642 Buckingham Place Tustin, CA 92780 / US | |||
03 /
WALKER, Wesley 905 Robinson Street Los Angeles, CA 90026 / US | |||
04 /
UDDIN, Jasim 125 S. Holliston Avenue Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | |||
05 /
SASAKI, Kenji, A. 600 N Wilson Avenue Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | |||
06 /
GIORDANI, Vincent 2816 Waverly Drive Los Angeles, CA 90039 / US | |||
07 /
BRYANTSEV, Vyacheslav 110 S. Michigan Avenue, Apt. 19 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | |||
08 /
BLANCO, Mario 9961 Workman Avenue Temple City, CA 91780 / US | |||
09 /
ADDISON, Dan, D. 1051 Palm Terrace Pasadena, CA 91104 / US | Representative(s) | Schiener, Jens Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [2020/13] |
Former [2013/09] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield South Yorkshire S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11772854.3 | 25.04.2011 | [2020/13] | WO2011US33821 | Priority number, date | US20100392014P | 11.10.2010 Original published format: US 392014 P | US20100327304P | 23.04.2010 Original published format: US 327304 P | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011133982 | Date: | 27.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2561573 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2561573 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M12/08, H01M4/38, H01M10/052, H01M4/86, H01M4/90, H01M4/92 | [2016/37] | CPC: |
H01M12/08 (EP,US);
H01M8/02 (KR);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M12/06 (KR);
H01M4/382 (EP,US);
H01M4/8626 (EP,US);
H01M4/9008 (EP,US);
H01M4/923 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0017 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/09] | H01M8/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSLICHE SAUERSTOFFENTWICKLUNGSKATALYSATOREN FÜR WIEDERAUFLADBARE METALL-LUFT-BATTERIEN | [2013/09] | English: | SOLUBLE OXYGEN EVOLVING CATALYSTS FOR RECHARGEABLE METAL-AIR BATTERIES | [2013/09] | French: | CATALYSEURS DÉGAGEANT DE L'OXYGÈNE SOLUBLES POUR ACCUMULATEURS MÉTAL-AIR RECHARGEABLES | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2012 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 09.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2011 | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 25.04.2020 | LU | 25.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.04.2011 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.04.2011 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3316126 (LEDUC JOSEPH ADRIEN M) [I] 1-4 * column 1, line 8 - line 13 * * column 5, line 38 - line 49 * * column 7, line 3 - line 6 * * column 7, line 24 - line 41 *; | [Y]US4255498 (YOSHIDA KAZUMASA) [Y] 6,7 * column 1, line 5 - line 7; claims 1-3, 10, 11 * * column 1, line 33 - line 54 * * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 52 *; | [Y]JP2004319324 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 8,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0010] , [0017] - [0019]; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US2005074663 (FARNETH WILLIAM E [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0049] , [0082] - [0091]; claims 1, 19, 20 *; | [A]US2005175894 (VISCO STEVEN J [US], et al) [A] 6,7,30 * paragraphs [0063] , [0064]; claims 1,10,21 *; | [XI]WO2007065899 (REVOLT TECHNOLOGY AS [NO], et al) [X] 36 * page 1, line 5 - line 8; claims 1, 2, 8 * * page 14, line 7 - line 25 * [I] 37,38; | [A]US2007243449 (SOTOMURA TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 6,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0031] - [0033] - [0043]; claims 1, 9 *; | [YA]WO2009025176 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 25 * abstract * [A] 6; | [A]JP2009259764 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [A] 1,36* paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0008] - [0010] , [0020]; claims 1,3-6,11 *; | [XYI]JP2010033890 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1,10,29,33,34,40 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0008] - [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0026]; claims 1,5 * [Y] 5-9,12,14,15,25 [I] 11,13,16-24,26-28,30-32,35,39; | [Y] - RONNY NEUMANN, "Activation of Molecular Oxygen, Polyoxometalates, and Liquid-Phase Catalytic Oxidation", INORGANIC CHEMISTRY, EASTON, US, (20100419), vol. 49, no. 8, doi:10.1021/ic9015383, ISSN 0020-1669, pages 3594 - 3601, XP055293236 [Y] 5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ic9015383 | [A] - HIRAI T ET AL, "Electrochemical Characteristics of Air Electrode with Fe Phthalocyanine for Metal-Air Batteries", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1983. INTELEC '83. FIFTH INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19831018), pages 367 - 373, XP031432428 [A] 6,7 * abstract * | [A] - NEBURCHILOV V ET AL, "A review on air cathodes for zinc-air fuel cells", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER SA, CH, vol. 195, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JPOWSOUR.2009.08.100, ISSN 0378-7753, (20100301), pages 1271 - 1291, (20090919), XP026733606 [A] 6 * abstract; part "1.4 Metal [...] porphyrine-based ORR catalysts (CoTMPP, FeTMPP-Cl/C)" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpowsour.2009.08.100 | [Y] - L. M. MOSHURCHAK ET AL, "Triphenylamines as a Class of Redox Shuttle Molecules for the Overcharge Protection of Lithium-Ion Cells", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (20071206), vol. 155, no. 2, doi:10.1149/1.2816229, ISSN 0013-4651, page A129, XP055293293 [Y] 12 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2816229 | [Y] - CLAUDIA BUHRMESTER ET AL, "Phenothiazine Molecules", JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20060101), vol. 153, no. 2, doi:10.1149/1.2140615, ISSN 0013-4651, page A288, XP055215837 [Y] 14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.2140615 | International search | [Y]US2004202937 (BARKER JEREMY [GB], et al); | [Y]US6855453 (BETT JOHN A S [US], et al); | [Y]US2005175894 (VISCO STEVEN J [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006097438 (ACAL ENERGY LTD [GB], et al); | [X]US2008096061 (BURCHARDT TRYGVE [CH]); | [Y]US2008318135 (SUNG DO KYONG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2009288946 (KINLEN PATRICK J [US], et al); | [Y]US7645543 (VISCO STEVEN J [US], et al) | Examination | EP2463950 | by applicant | US3316126 | JP2010033890 |