EP2628210 - A HEARING AID COMPRISING AN ANTENNA DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/34] | AN ANTENNA DEVICE | ||
[2018/32] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | Change: Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.2024 | Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN Hearing A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2019/01] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖZDEN, Sinasi Signalvej 145 1. tv. DK-2860 Søborg / DK | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2019/02] |
Former [2013/34] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 11772919.4 | 12.10.2011 | [2019/02] | WO2011EP67755 | Priority number, date | EP20110174155 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: EP 11174155 | DK20110070393 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: DK 201170393 | DK20110070392 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: DK 201170392 | DK20110000273 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: DK 201100273 | DK20110000272 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: DK 201100272 | DK20100000931 | 12.10.2010 Original published format: DK 201000931 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012059302 | Date: | 10.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2628210 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2628210 | Date: | 09.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/52, H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04, H01Q7/00, H01Q1/27, H01Q21/28 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q1/48 (EP,US);
H01Q1/52 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/02] |
Former [2013/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÖRGERÄT MIT ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | [2018/32] | English: | A HEARING AID COMPRISING AN ANTENNA DEVICE | [2018/32] | French: | PROTHESE AUDITIVE COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE | [2018/32] |
Former [2013/34] | ANTENNENVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2013/34] | AN ANTENNA DEVICE | ||
Former [2013/34] | DISPOSITIF D'ANTENNE | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 07.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2019
11.10.2019
ADMISSIBLE Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK Opponent's representative Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Postfach 10 18 30 40009 Düsseldorf / DE | [2020/36] |
Former [2019/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.2019
Oticon A/S Kongebakken 9 2765 Smørum / DK Opponent's representative TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | 23.10.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.03.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | Appeal following opposition | 02.06.2021 | Appeal received No. T0779/21 | 02.06.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 02.08.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.08.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2011 | AL | 09.01.2019 | AT | 09.01.2019 | CY | 09.01.2019 | CZ | 09.01.2019 | EE | 09.01.2019 | ES | 09.01.2019 | FI | 09.01.2019 | HR | 09.01.2019 | IT | 09.01.2019 | LT | 09.01.2019 | LV | 09.01.2019 | MC | 09.01.2019 | MK | 09.01.2019 | MT | 09.01.2019 | NL | 09.01.2019 | PL | 09.01.2019 | RO | 09.01.2019 | RS | 09.01.2019 | SE | 09.01.2019 | SI | 09.01.2019 | SK | 09.01.2019 | SM | 09.01.2019 | TR | 09.01.2019 | BG | 09.04.2019 | NO | 09.04.2019 | GR | 10.04.2019 | IS | 09.05.2019 | PT | 09.05.2019 | IE | 12.10.2019 | LU | 12.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | GB | 12.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | DK | 31.10.2022 | FR | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | [2023/47] |
Former [2023/46] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MK | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
DK | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MK | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
FR | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2022/31] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MK | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/34] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
MT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 09.01.2019 | ||
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CY | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
IE | 12.10.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
LU | 12.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
MC | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
TR | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SI | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
SM | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 09.01.2019 | |
AT | 09.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2019 | ||
EE | 09.01.2019 | ||
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RO | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
SK | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.01.2019 | |
ES | 09.01.2019 | ||
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
IT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
HR | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
LV | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
RS | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IS | 09.05.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
BG | 09.04.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
GR | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 09.01.2019 | |
FI | 09.01.2019 | ||
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
PL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
SE | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 09.01.2019 | |
LT | 09.01.2019 | ||
NL | 09.01.2019 | ||
NO | 09.04.2019 | ||
PT | 09.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/30] | NL | 09.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO9641498 (ANDERSON JAMES C [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11,17-28 * the whole document * [Y] 12-16 [I] 3,8-10; | [XYI]EP1763145 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,10-19,28 * the whole document * [Y] 12-16 [I] 9,20-27; | [XI]US2009243944 (JUNG KANG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-8,10-19,28 * the whole document * [I] 9,20-27; | [XI]WO2010065356 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-19,28 * the whole document *[I] 9,20-27 | Opposition | US5381484 | WO9641498 | US2005007294 | EP1531649 | US2006109183 | WO2006117409 | US2007080889 | US7256747 | US2009046879 | EP2076065 | WO2009098858 | US2009224991 | US2009231204 | US2010074461 | EP2200120 | US2010321269 | - F Kuk, Et Al, "MPO A FORGOTTEN PARAMETER IN HEARING AID FITTING", pages 1 - 10, URL: hearingreview.com/2008/mpo-a-forgotten-parameter-in-hearing-aid-fitting/, (20200129), XP055663205 | - "ERC REPORT 83, INTERFERENCE FROM INDUSTRIAL SCIENTIFIC AND MEDICAL (ISM) MACHINES", Anonym, ERC REPORT 83, Luxembourg, (20000601), pages 1 - 15, XP055663211 | - Anonym, SKMM WTS SRD. Technical specification for Short range devices, (20070101), XP055663215 |