EP2625465 - DOMESTIC APPLIANCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.07.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2013/33] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GALINDO PEREZ, Juan Jose Jenaro Checa 40-4º E-50007 Zaragoza / ES | 02 /
GRANDE MAINAR, Maria Lourdes Marqués de la cadena 41 Esc.3-7ºA E-50014 Zaragoza / ES | 03 /
PEREZ VISA, Enrique Javier Martin Cortes 14-3ºB E-50005 Zaragoza / ES | [2013/33] | Application number, filing date | 11773887.2 | 29.09.2011 | WO2011IB54279 | Priority number, date | ES20100031494 | 08.10.2010 Original published format: ES 201031494 | [2013/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2012046165 | Date: | 12.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2625465 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24C7/08, A47L15/00, D06F39/00 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A47L15/0047 (EP,US);
F24C7/08 (KR);
F24C7/082 (EP,US);
G01M99/005 (US);
A47L2401/06 (EP,US);
A47L2401/30 (EP,US);
A47L2501/26 (EP,US);
A47L2501/32 (EP,US);
D06F2105/58 (EP,US);
D06F34/28 (EP,US);
H02J2310/64 (EP,US);
Y02B70/30 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/33] | Title | German: | HAUSGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2013/33] | English: | DOMESTIC APPLIANCE DEVICE | [2013/33] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR APPAREILS MÉNAGERS | [2013/33] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/33] | 10.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2021 | 25.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/32] | 05.04.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/32] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]DE3932170 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [YD] 3,10* the whole document *; | [XYI]US5635895 (MURR WILLIAM C [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,13 * the whole document * [Y] 3,7,8,10,14 [I] 11,12; | [Y]US2003177776 (GHENT BOBBY A [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,14 * the whole document * | Examination | EP1372238 | US2006123807 | EP1981144 | DE102007032053 | WO2010031012 | US2010117625 | EP2423604 | EP2494737 | by applicant | DE3932170 | EP0844326 |