EP2564672 - ILLUMINATION APPARATUS METHODS AND SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OR Technologies Pty Ltd 17-19 Jets Court Melbourne Airport VIC 3045 / AU | [2017/49] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Organic Response Pty Ltd 1131 Toorak Road Camberwell, Victoria 3124 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISHOP, Daniel John 25 Sartori Street Burwood East, Victoria 3151 / AU | 02 /
ANDREWS, Geoffrey Kenneth 4 Lincoln Street Glen Iris, Victoria 3146 / AU | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2019/48] |
Former [2013/28] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11774184.3 | 21.04.2011 | [2019/48] | WO2011AU00459 | Priority number, date | AU20100901746 | 26.04.2010 Original published format: AU 2010901746 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134003 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564672 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564672 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G08C17/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
G08C23/04 (EP,US);
H05B47/11 (EP,US);
H05B47/115 (EP,US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
G08C2201/51 (EP,US);
H05B47/105 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN, -VERFAHREN UND -SYSTEME | [2013/10] | English: | ILLUMINATION APPARATUS METHODS AND SYSTEMS | [2013/10] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE, SES PROCÉDÉS ET SES SYSTÈMES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 16.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 18.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2020
21.12.2020
WITHDRAWN Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Höchsterstraße 8 6850 Dornbirn / AT Opponent's representative Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/04] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2020
21.12.2020
WITHDRAWN Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Höchsterstraße 8 6850 Dornbirn / AT Opponent's representative Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2020/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.2020
28.08.2020
ADMISSIBLE Zumtobel Lighting GmbH Höchsterstraße 8 6850 Dornbirn / AT Opponent's representative Beder, Jens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | 10.09.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.12.2020 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2021/23] | 08.01.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 18.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 01.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 24.02.2017 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2017/36] | 02.11.2017 | Resumption of proceedings | [2017/36] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2011 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 21.04.2020 | LU | 21.04.2020 | BE | 30.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 21.04.2011 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 21.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
BE | 30.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 21.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2009003279 (CARMANAH TECHNOLOGIES CORP [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 26 * * page 9, line 30 - page 13, line 6 * * page 13, line 26 - page 15, line 29 * * page 17, line 13 - line 16 * * page 23, line 27 - page 24, line 12 * [I] 8,9; | [X]US2010060173 (SCHARF JOSHUA [US]) [X] 1,8,10-15* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0070] * | International search | [A]US2008258646 (BEIJ MARCEL [NL], et al); | [X]US7529594 (WALTERS JEFF D [US], et al); | [X]US7633406 (MIKI MITSUNORI [JP]) | Examination | JP2009054496 | Opposition | US5220250 | JPH07312294 | JPH09283282 | JPH11214167 | JP2001210476 | JP2003234197 | US2007057807 | WO2008033029 | US2008258646 | WO2009003279 | JP2009054496 | WO2009137041 | US7623042 | US7633406 | US2010060173 | WO2010124315 | EP2499884 |