EP2563613 - RECHARGEABLE BATTERY PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gyenes Innovations Limited 29 Wood Street Stratford upon Avon Warwickshire CV37 6JG / GB | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GYENES, Lazlo 90 New Wokingham Road Crowthorne Berkshire RG45 6JP / GB | 02 /
CORDELL, Michael 3 The Paddocks Frederick Road Birmingham West Midlands B15 1JB / GB | 03 /
SORE, James c/o Gyenes Innovations Limited 29 Wood Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6JG / GB | 04 /
WOOD, Tom c/o Gyenes Innovations Limited 29 Wood Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6JG / GB | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Symons, Rupert Jonathan, et al Clifton Cowley Legal 25 Meer Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire CV37 6QB / GB | [2014/01] |
Former [2013/31] | Lessard, Jason Donat, et al Clifton Cowley Legal 25 Meer Street Stratford-upon-Avon, Warks. CV37 6QB / GB | ||
Former [2013/10] | Lessard, Jason Donat Hepworth Browne 29 Wood Street Stratford-upon-Avon Warwickshire, CV37 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11774491.2 | 03.05.2011 | WO2011GB50864 | Priority number, date | GB20100007246 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: GB 201007246 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011135385 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2563613 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
B60L53/00 (EP,US);
B60L3/12 (EP,US);
B60L53/34 (EP,US);
B60L58/10 (EP,US);
B60L58/16 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H02J2310/48 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/0049 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | WIEDERAUFLADBARE BATTERIEPACKS | [2013/10] | English: | RECHARGEABLE BATTERY PACKAGES | [2013/10] | French: | BLOCS BATTERIES RECHARGEABLES | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/21] | 09.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/21] | Request for further processing for: | 02.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 02.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2013 | 31.05.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1319556 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005027465 (POZSGAY BRIAN T [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2462677 (PARK AND POWER LTD [GB]) [X] 17* abstract *; | [XI]WO2010022059 (AUSTIN CHRISTOPHER B [US]) [X] 17 * abstract * * figures 2-17,22-23,27 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0018] , [0067] , [0095] , [0078] , [0096] , [0105] , [0120] , [0123] , [0168] , [0171] , [0177] , [0178] * [I] 1-16; | [A]US2010045450 (SUZUKI NAOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |