EP2565978 - BATTERY MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKASHIMA, Takuya c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku OSAKA-SHI, OSAKA 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
YASUI, Shunsuke c/o Panasonic Corporation IPROC 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi, Chuo-ku OSAKA-SHI, OSAKA 540-6207 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11774553.9 | 02.02.2011 | WO2011JP00569 | Priority number, date | JP20100103329 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010103329 | [2013/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135762 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2565978 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/50, H01M2/10 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H01M10/63 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/65 (EP,US);
H01M50/20 (KR);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
H01M50/509 (EP,US);
H01M10/625 (EP,US);
H01M10/643 (EP,US);
H01M50/296 (EP,US);
H01M50/505 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEMODUL | [2013/10] | English: | BATTERY MODULE | [2013/10] | French: | MODULE DE BATTERIE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2012 | Translation filed | 27.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 19.06.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08148189 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH11301285 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [Y]JP2000021457 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JP2004362949 (SONY CORP); | [X]JP2007213939 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2009259567 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2010086843 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |