EP2563135 - PLANT DISEASE CONTROL COMPOSITION AND ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUZAKI, Yuichi 8-7-20-318, Hon-machi Toyonaka-shi Osaka 560-0021 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/37] |
Former [2013/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11774619.8 | 25.04.2011 | [2016/37] | WO2011JP02416 | Priority number, date | JP20100104093 | 28.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010104093 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011135833 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563135 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2563135 | Date: | 14.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/56, A01N43/50, A01N43/653, A01N43/80, A01N43/836, A01N47/38, A01N55/00, A01P3/00 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
A01N43/56 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A01N37/18 (KR);
A01N43/46 (KR);
A01N43/50 (BR);
A01N43/653 (BR);
A01N43/80 (BR);
A01N43/82 (BR);
A01N43/92 (KR);
A01N47/22 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/56, A01N43/50, A01N43/653, A01N43/80, A01N43/82, A01N47/38, A01N55/00, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON PFLANZENKRANKHEITEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG | [2013/10] | English: | PLANT DISEASE CONTROL COMPOSITION AND ITS USE | [2013/10] | French: | COMPOSITION PHYTOSANITAIRE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.09.2016 | AT | 14.09.2016 | CY | 14.09.2016 | CZ | 14.09.2016 | EE | 14.09.2016 | FI | 14.09.2016 | HR | 14.09.2016 | LT | 14.09.2016 | LV | 14.09.2016 | MC | 14.09.2016 | MK | 14.09.2016 | RO | 14.09.2016 | RS | 14.09.2016 | SE | 14.09.2016 | SI | 14.09.2016 | SK | 14.09.2016 | SM | 14.09.2016 | TR | 14.09.2016 | BG | 14.12.2016 | NO | 14.12.2016 | GR | 15.12.2016 | IS | 14.01.2017 | PT | 16.01.2017 | IE | 25.04.2017 | LU | 25.04.2017 | MT | 25.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
MK | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
CY | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 14.09.2016 | |
AT | 14.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
MT | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.04.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
LU | 25.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
MC | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SI | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 14.09.2016 | |
CZ | 14.09.2016 | ||
EE | 14.09.2016 | ||
FI | 14.09.2016 | ||
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RO | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
SK | 14.09.2016 | ||
SM | 14.09.2016 | ||
BG | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
IS | 14.01.2017 | ||
PT | 16.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
LV | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
GR | 15.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
HR | 14.09.2016 | ||
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
RS | 14.09.2016 | ||
SE | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 14.09.2016 | |
LT | 14.09.2016 | ||
NO | 14.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 14.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008087163 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2009056620 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5* claims 1,3 * | International search | [Y]WO8602641 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]JPS6296472 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]WO9212970 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [Y]JP2009502747 (BASF SE) | by applicant | WO8602641 | WO9212970 | WO2008087163 | WO2009056620 |