EP2566213 - BASE STATION APPARATUS, MOBILE TERMINAL APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABE, Tetsushi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
MIKI, Nobuhiko c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 04 /
OKUBO, Naoto c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 05 /
JATURONG, Sangiamwong c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO INC. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11775115.6 | 28.04.2011 | WO2011JP60379 | Priority number, date | JP20100105941 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: JP 2010105941 | [2013/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011136334 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2566213 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/16, H04W16/32, H04W72/12 | [2013/10] | CPC: |
H04W72/541 (EP,US);
H04W16/08 (EP,US);
H04W16/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | BASISSTATIONSVORRICHTUNG, MOBILES ENDGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2013/10] | English: | BASE STATION APPARATUS, MOBILE TERMINAL APPARATUS AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2013/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE STATION DE BASE, APPAREIL DE TERMINAL MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2012 | Translation filed | 26.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 10.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2009049661 (NTT DOCOMO INC); | [Y]JP2010045547 (NTT DOCOMO INC); |