EP2563447 - A BALLOON INFLATING DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR INFLATING A BALLOON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanyang Technological University 50 Nanyang Avenue Singapore 639798 / SG | For all designated states National University of Singapore 10 Kent Ridge Crescent Singapore 119260 / SG | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHEE, Soo Jay, Louis Nanyang Technological University c/o Nanyang Innovation&Enterprise Office (NIEO) Innovation Centre Blk 1 Unit 100, 16 Nanyang Drive Singapore 637722 / SG | 02 /
WONG, Kai Juan Nanyang Technological University c/o Nanyang Innovation&Enterprise Office (NIEO) Innovation Centre Blk 1 Unit 100, 16 Nanyang Drive Singapore 637722 / SG | 03 /
TAN, Su Lim Nanyang Technological University c/o Nanyang Innovation&Enterprise Office (NIEO) Innovation Centre Blk 1 Unit 100, 16 Nanyang Drive Singapore 637722 / SG | 04 /
KENCANA, Andy Prima Nanyang Technological University c/o Nanyang Innovation&Enterprise Office (NIEO) Innovation Centre Blk 1 Unit 100,16 Nanyang Drive Singapore 637722 / SG | 05 /
HO, Khek Yu National University of Singapore c/o Industry Liaison Office 21 Heng Mui Keng Terrace, Level 5 Singapore 119613 / SG | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Barton, Matthew Thomas Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11775391.3 | 03.05.2011 | WO2011SG00169 | Priority number, date | US20100329997P | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 329997 P | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011136745 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2563447 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 03.11.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/00, // A61M25/10 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
A61F5/0046 (EP,US);
A61M29/02 (US);
A61F5/003 (EP,US);
A61M25/10181 (US);
A61M2025/1054 (EP,US);
A61M25/10184 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | A61M29/00, A61F2/04, A61M31/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | BALLONAUFBLASVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBLASEN EINES BALLONS | [2013/10] | English: | A BALLOON INFLATING DEVICE AND A METHOD FOR INFLATING A BALLOON | [2013/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GONFLAGE DE BALLONNET ET PROCÉDÉ AFFÉRENT | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 27.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 08.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2013 | 31.05.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006063593 (WELTLESEN RUNE WESSEL [DK], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1, 2, 4,5, 7 * * paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0067] ** paragraph [0068] * | International search | [X]US3845970 (HERRMANN G); | [A]EP0103481 (AINSWORTH NOMINEES PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]WO8700034 (TAYLOR THOMAS VINCENT); | [A]US5129915 (CANTENYS JOSE [CH]); | [X]WO2006075944 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al); | [X]GB2448300 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]); | [X]WO2010045482 (OBALON THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US4133315 | US6579301 |