EP2637969 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING TRICHLOROSILANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.09.2016 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2016 [2016/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜH, Ekkehard Feldbergstraße 7 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 02 /
RAULEDER, Hartwig Uhlandweg 51A 79618 Rheinfelden / DE | 03 /
NOWITZKI, Bernd Kreuzstr. 155 45770 Marl / DE | [2013/38] | Application number, filing date | 11775752.6 | 13.10.2011 | WO2011EP67847 | Priority number, date | DE20101043646 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: DE102010043646 | [2013/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012062526 | Date: | 18.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2637969 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/107 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
C01B33/1071 (EP,US);
C01B33/10763 (US);
C01B33/10773 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRICHLORSILAN | [2013/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING TRICHLOROSILANE | [2013/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE TRICHLOROSILANE | [2013/38] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2013 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 13.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/40] | 01.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3565590 (BRACKEN RONALD C) [X] 1,2,6,11 * column 1, line 61 - column 4, line 71 * [I] 3-5,7-10; | [XI]DE2825415 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC) [X] 1,2,6,11 * page 8, line 5 - page 11, line 5 * * figure -; claim - * [I] 3-5,7-10; | [IA]JPH02172811 (MITSUBISHI KAKOKI KK) [I] 1-3,5,6,11 * abstract *[A] 4,7-10 | by applicant | GB575669 | DE3640172 | WO2005102927 | WO2005102928 | WO2009143823 | WO2009143824 | - HOLLEMANN-WIBERG, Lehrbuch der anorganischen Chemie, (1976), page 539,540 |