EP2608939 - APPARATUS FOR CUTTING AND BEVELLING A PLASTIC PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rothenberger AG Spessartstraße 2-4 65779 Kelkheim / DE | [2013/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Erik Hegnet 1 DK-5700 Svendborg / DK | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Launhardt, Thomas, et al Parkstraße 11-13 65549 Limburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Mill, Andreas Rechtsanwalt & Notar Dr.-Wolff-Str. 4A 65549 Limburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11775768.2 | 24.10.2011 | [2016/08] | WO2011EP68570 | Priority number, date | DK20100000968 | 25.10.2010 Original published format: DK 201000968 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012055822 | Date: | 03.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608939 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2608939 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B26D3/02, B26D3/16, B26D3/18, B26D7/01, B26D7/02 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
B26D3/02 (EP);
B26D3/16 (EP);
B26D3/166 (EP);
B26D7/02 (EP);
B26D2007/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND ANFASEN EINES KUNSTSTOFFROHRES | [2015/37] | English: | APPARATUS FOR CUTTING AND BEVELLING A PLASTIC PIPE | [2013/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA COUPE ET LA CHANFREINAGE D'UN TUYAU DE MATERIAL POLIMÈRIQUE | [2015/37] |
Former [2013/27] | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN UND ABKANTEN EINES KUNSTSTOFFROHRS | ||
Former [2013/27] | APPAREIL POUR COUPER ET CHANFREINER UN TUYAU EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2013 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2011 | AL | 24.02.2016 | AT | 24.02.2016 | BE | 24.02.2016 | CY | 24.02.2016 | CZ | 24.02.2016 | DK | 24.02.2016 | EE | 24.02.2016 | FI | 24.02.2016 | HR | 24.02.2016 | IS | 24.02.2016 | LT | 24.02.2016 | LV | 24.02.2016 | MC | 24.02.2016 | MK | 24.02.2016 | NL | 24.02.2016 | PL | 24.02.2016 | RO | 24.02.2016 | RS | 24.02.2016 | SE | 24.02.2016 | SI | 24.02.2016 | SK | 24.02.2016 | SM | 24.02.2016 | TR | 24.02.2016 | BG | 24.05.2016 | NO | 24.05.2016 | GR | 25.05.2016 | PT | 24.06.2016 | IE | 24.10.2016 | LU | 24.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | [2023/49] |
Former [2021/21] | HU | 24.10.2011 | |
AL | 24.02.2016 | ||
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 24.10.2011 | |
AL | 24.02.2016 | ||
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.10.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IS | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.10.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
TR | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.10.2011 | |
AT | 24.02.2016 | ||
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CY | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
MC | 24.02.2016 | ||
MK | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
IE | 24.10.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
LU | 24.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SI | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
BG | 24.05.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
BE | 24.02.2016 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
CZ | 24.02.2016 | ||
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RO | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
SK | 24.02.2016 | ||
SM | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
EE | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
DK | 24.02.2016 | ||
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LV | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
RS | 24.02.2016 | ||
SE | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
PT | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 24.02.2016 | |
FI | 24.02.2016 | ||
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
IT | 24.02.2016 | ||
LT | 24.02.2016 | ||
NL | 24.02.2016 | ||
PL | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 24.02.2016 | |
HR | 24.02.2016 | ||
NO | 24.05.2016 | ||
GR | 25.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007028451 (KAEHR LYLE D [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US7578643 (KAROW PHILIP [US]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [AD]US2005022353 (VIOLA DANIEL [CA], et al) [AD] 1,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5027681 | US6938313 | US4412401 |