EP2627716 - COATING COMPOSITIONS WITH ANTICORROSION PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bunge Amorphic Solutions LLC 50 Main Street, 7th Floor White Plains, NY 10606 / US | For all designated states Universidade Estadual de Campinas Caixa Postal 6154 Cidade Universitária "Zeferino Vaz" Barão Geraldo 13083-970 Campinas SP / BR | [2013/39] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Bunge Amorphic Solutions LLC 50 Main Street, 7th Floor White Plains, NY 10606 / US | ||
For all designated states Universidade Estadual de Campinas Caixa Postal 6154 Cidade Universitária "Zeferino Vaz" Barão Geraldo 13084-971 Campinas SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSCANTE, Raymond, E. 20547 Manzanita Avenue Yorba Linda CA 92886 / US | 02 /
GALEMBECK, Fernando Rúa Olímpio Silva Miranda 674 Cidade Universitária 13083-970 Campinas, SP, CEP / BR | 03 /
BRAGA, Melissa Rúa Valentina Penteado De Freitas 160 Parque Das Universidades 13086-140 Campinas, SP, CEP / BR | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/31] |
Former [2013/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11776972.9 | 14.10.2011 | WO2011US56429 | Priority number, date | US20100905999 | 15.10.2010 Original published format: US 905999 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012051573 | Date: | 19.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2627716 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.04.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2627716 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
C09D5/084 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (KR);
B05D7/14 (KR);
C09D201/00 (KR);
Y10T428/31529 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31699 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KORROSIONSSCHUTZEIGENSCHAFTEN | [2013/34] | English: | COATING COMPOSITIONS WITH ANTICORROSION PROPERTIES | [2013/34] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT PRÉSENTANT DES PROPRIÉTÉS ANTICORROSION | [2013/34] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/34] | 12.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15178396.6 / EP2985320 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.07.2015 | BG | 29.07.2015 | CY | 29.07.2015 | EE | 29.07.2015 | HR | 29.07.2015 | LT | 29.07.2015 | LV | 29.07.2015 | MK | 29.07.2015 | MT | 29.07.2015 | RS | 29.07.2015 | SI | 29.07.2015 | SM | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.10.2015 | IS | 29.11.2015 | [2020/48] |
Former [2018/47] | AL | 29.07.2015 | |
BG | 29.07.2015 | ||
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | BG | 29.07.2015 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MK | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/49] | BG | 29.07.2015 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | BG | 29.07.2015 | |
CY | 29.07.2015 | ||
EE | 29.07.2015 | ||
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
MT | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
SM | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/04] | EE | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
SI | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 29.07.2015 | |
HR | 29.07.2015 | ||
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 29.07.2015 | |
LT | 29.07.2015 | ||
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
RS | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
IS | 29.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 29.07.2015 | |
LV | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 29.07.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3233092 (GREINACHER EKKEHARD DR RER NAT) [X] 1-87* examples 1-7; claims 1,5-7 *; | [X]GB2221684 (TIOXIDE GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 1-87 * example 1; claims 1,15-19 *; | [X]US2008085965 (IMAKITA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-87 * examples 1-5; claims 1,5,6 * | by applicant | US2006045831 | US2008038556 |